EP1456233 - PROCESS OF PURIFICATION OF HAEMOCYANIN FROM ABALONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/38] | HAEMOCYANIN FROM ABALONE AND PROCESS OF PURIFICATION THEREOF | ||
[2007/37] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Queensland Bioprocessing Technology PTY Ltd 30 Boothby Street Kedron, QLD 4031 / AU | [2004/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANICKAVASAGAM, Bhanumathy 5 Tamarix Street Chapel Hill, QLD 4069 / AU | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Jennings, Tara Romaine, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Jennings, Tara Romaine, et al F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2004/38] | Casey, Lindsay Joseph, et al F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 01942884.6 | 15.06.2001 | [2004/38] | WO2001AU00710 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02102844 | Date: | 27.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1456233 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 27.12.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/08, C07K14/435 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
B01D15/166 (EP);
B01D15/327 (EP);
C07K14/435 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/38] | C07K14/435, B01D15/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUFREINIGUNG VON HÄMOCYANIN AUS ABALONEN | [2007/37] | English: | PROCESS OF PURIFICATION OF HAEMOCYANIN FROM ABALONE | [2007/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION D'HEMOCYANINE D'ORMEAU | [2007/37] |
Former [2004/38] | HÄMOCYANIN AUS ABALONEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN AUFREINIGUNG | ||
Former [2004/38] | HAEMOCYANIN FROM ABALONE AND PROCESS OF PURIFICATION THEREOF | ||
Former [2004/38] | HEMOCYANINE D'ORMEAU ET PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION ASSOCIE | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 05.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 08.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/26] | 10.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.03.2004 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | 09.03.2004 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | 09.03.2004 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | 09.03.2004 | CY   M02   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | 09.03.2004 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | 09.03.2004 | DK   M02   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | 09.03.2004 | ES   M02   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | 09.03.2004 | FI   M02   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | 09.03.2004 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | 09.03.2004 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | 09.03.2004 | GR   M02   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | 09.03.2004 | IE   M02   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | 09.03.2004 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | 09.03.2004 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | 09.03.2004 | MC   M02   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | 09.03.2004 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | 09.03.2004 | PT   M02   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | 09.03.2004 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | 09.03.2004 | TR   M02   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.03.2004 | M02   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 15.01.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.05.2004 | 30.06.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6184360 (BURTON LOUIS E [US], et al) [Y] 1-26 * claim - *; | [X] - HERSKOVITS THEODORE T., "Recent aspects of the subunit organization and dissociation of hemocyanins", COMPARATIVE BIOCHEMISTRY AND PHYSIOLOGY, PART B: BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1988), vol. 91, no. 4, pages 597 - 611, XP002378526 [X] 27,28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0305-0491(88)90179-4 | [YX] - LIEB B ET AL, "SUBUNIT ORGANIZATION OF THE ABALONE HALIOTIS TUBERCULATA HEMACYANIN TYPE 2(HTH2), AND THE CDNA SEQUENCE ENCODING ITS FUNCTIONAL UNITS D,E,F,G AND H", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, BERLIN, DE, (199910), vol. 265, no. 1, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 134 - 144, XP000952187 [Y] 1-26 * the whole document * [X] 27,28 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1432-1327.1999.00694.x | [A] - DECKER H ET AL, "Tyrosinase/catecholoxidase activity of hemocyanins: structural basis and molecular mechanism", TRENDS IN BIOCHEMICAL SCIENCES, ELSEVIER, HAYWARDS, GB, (20000801), vol. 25, no. 8, ISSN 0968-0004, pages 392 - 397, XP004215187 [A] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0004(00)01602-9 | International search | [X] - ELLERTON H.D. ET AL., "Structure of the hemocyanin from paua (abelone) Haliotis iris", LIFE CHEMISTRY REPORTS, SUPPLEMENT SERIES (STRUCTURE AND FUNCTION OF INVERTEBRATE RESPIRATORY PROTEIN), (1983), vol. 1, pages 129 - 132, XP001237270 | [X] - LIEB B. ET AL., "Subunit organization of the abalone Haliotis tuberculata hemocyanin type 3 (HtH2) and the cDNA sequence encoding its functional units d, e, f, g and h", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (199910), vol. 265, no. 1, pages 134 - 144, XP000952187 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1432-1327.1999.00694.x | [X] - HARRIS J.R. ET AL., "Haliotis tuberculata hemocyanin (HtH): Analysis of oligomeric stability of HtH1 and HtH2 and comparison with the keyhole limpet hemocyanin KLH1 and KLH2", MICRON, (200012), vol. 31, no. 6, pages 613 - 622, XP002997334 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-4328(99)00145-6 | [X] - SCHUTZ J. ET AL., "Isolation and spectroscopic characterization of the structural subunits of keyhole limpet hemocyanin", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (20010407), vol. 1546, no. 2, pages 325 - 336, XP004279187 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-4838(01)00152-2 | [X] - POLSON A. ET AL., "Agarose: A possible universal gel exclusion agent", PREPARATIVE BIOCHEMISTRY, (1984), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 173 - 179, XP002997351 | [A] - VESTERBERG O. ET AL., "New procedure for concentration and analytical isoelectric focusing of proteins", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (19780612), vol. 534, no. 2, pages 369 - 373, XP002997335 |