EP1285439 - EMBODIMENT FOR THE CONTROL OF AN OPTICAL READING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERMANNS, Ingo Humboldtstrasse 15 31134 Hildesheim / DE | [2003/09] | Application number, filing date | 01943063.6 | 11.05.2001 | [2003/09] | WO2001DE01794 | Priority number, date | DE2000123581 | 13.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10023581 | [2003/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0188909 | Date: | 22.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1285439 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1285439 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/085 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
G11B7/08582 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/48] |
Former [2003/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | GESTALTUNG DER FÜHRUNG EINER OPTISCHEN ABTASTVORRICHTUNG | [2003/09] | English: | EMBODIMENT FOR THE CONTROL OF AN OPTICAL READING DEVICE | [2003/09] | French: | GUIDAGE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE BALAYAGE OPTIQUE | [2003/09] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 21.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS6098564 ; | [A]JPS58155576 ; | [A]DE201925 (BOLLINGER ET AL); | [X]GB2217094 (TANASHIN DENKI CO [JP]) [X] 1-9 * page 7, line 10 - page 9, line 21; figures 2,5 *; | [X]US5682282 (KATO KAZUNARI [JP]) [X] 1-9 * column 5, line 34 - column 6, line 57; figure 4 *; | [X]US5995479 (TAKIZAWA TERUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 10, line 55 - column 11, line 23; figure 5 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851003), vol. 009, no. 246, Database accession no. (P - 393), & JP60098564 A 19850601 (ZENERARU:KK) [X] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831210), vol. 007, no. 278, Database accession no. (P - 242), & JP58155576 A 19830916 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] * abstract * |