EP1282520 - DEVICES FOR PRESSING A BLANKET ON A CYLINDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2003/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDER, Georg Fritz-Haber-Str. 13 97080 Würzburg / DE | 02 /
SCHÄFER, Karl, Robert Brunnenstr. 1 97222 Rimpar / DE | [2003/07] | Application number, filing date | 01943081.8 | 16.05.2001 | [2003/07] | WO2001DE01842 | Priority number, date | DE2000124329 | 17.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10024329 | [2003/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0187614 | Date: | 22.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1282520 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1282520 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41F27/12 | [2003/07] | CPC: |
B41F27/1206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM ANDRÜCKEN EINES AUFZUGES AUF EINEN ZYLINDER | [2003/07] | English: | DEVICES FOR PRESSING A BLANKET ON A CYLINDER | [2003/07] | French: | DISPOSITIFS PERMETTANT DE PRESSER UN BLANCHET SUR UN CYLINDRE | [2003/07] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/07] | 24.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.12.2007 | DK | 12.12.2007 | FI | 12.12.2007 | IE | 12.12.2007 | NL | 12.12.2007 | TR | 12.12.2007 | SE | 12.03.2008 | GR | 13.03.2008 | ES | 23.03.2008 | PT | 12.05.2008 | AT | 16.05.2008 | LU | 16.05.2008 | BE | 31.05.2008 | IT | 31.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 12.12.2007 | |
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
IE | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
TR | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
AT | 16.05.2008 | ||
LU | 16.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 12.12.2007 | |
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
IE | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
AT | 16.05.2008 | ||
LU | 16.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CY | 12.12.2007 | |
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
IE | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
AT | 16.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 12.12.2007 | |
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
IE | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | DK | 12.12.2007 | |
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
IE | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | DK | 12.12.2007 | |
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
IE | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | DK | 12.12.2007 | |
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
IE | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 12.12.2007 | |
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
IE | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 12.12.2007 | |
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | FI | 12.12.2007 | |
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | FI | 12.12.2007 | |
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | FI | 12.12.2007 | |
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | FI | 12.12.2007 | |
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | SE | 12.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0712725 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE19639800 (KBA PLANETA AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |