EP1272158 - PACK COMPRISED OF FLEXIBLE SUPPORTS SUITED FOR TAKING UP LIQUIDS, CARE SET CONTAINING THIS PACK, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PACK AND COSMETIC TREATMENT METHOD INVOLVING THE USE OF THIS PACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Suwelack Skin & Health Care AG Josef Suwelack Strasse 48727 Billerbeck / DE | [2003/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEWES-SCHWARZER, Petra Merschwiese 2a 48308 Senden / DE | [2003/02] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Postfach 18 04 09 40571 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Postfach 18 04 09 40571 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2003/28] | Roos, Peter, et al Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Postfach 180409 40571 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2003/02] | Sieckmann, Ralf, Dr., et al Cohausz Dawidowicz Hannig & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01943205.3 | 29.03.2001 | [2003/02] | WO2001EP03623 | Priority number, date | DE20001017530 | 10.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10017530 | [2003/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0176550 | Date: | 18.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1272158 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1272158 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A45D44/00 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
A61K8/65 (EP,US);
A45D44/002 (EP,US);
A61K8/0212 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24322 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/21] |
Former [2003/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESICHTSMASKE AUS EINER BAHN MIT LÖSBAR MITEINANDER VERBUNDENEN TEILKOMPONENTEN | [2003/02] | English: | PACK COMPRISED OF FLEXIBLE SUPPORTS SUITED FOR TAKING UP LIQUIDS, CARE SET CONTAINING THIS PACK, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PACK AND COSMETIC TREATMENT METHOD INVOLVING THE USE OF THIS PACK | [2003/02] | French: | MASQUE CONSTITUE D'UNE BANDE DOTEE DE DEUX COMPOSANTS PARTIELS RELIES DE FA ON AMOVIBLE ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT COSMETIQUE DU VISAGE | [2003/02] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 13.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2503561 (SETON CO [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0063875 (MAX FACTOR & CO [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0094285 (SANOFI SA [FR]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]WO9800117 (ALGOS PHARM CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [AP]EP1029892 (SUWELACK SKIN & HEALTH CARE AG [DE]) [AP] 1-13 * the whole document * |