EP1180222 - CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE GEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2002 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Doganer, Serkan Mozartstrasse 10 a 22083 Hamburg / DE | [2002/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/08] | Representative(s) | Kloiber, Thomas VKK Patentanwälte PartG mbB An der Alster 84 20099 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Kloiber, Thomas Vonnemann Kloiber & Kollegen An der Alster 84 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2002/08] | Kloiber, Thomas, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Vonnemann, Kloiber, Lewald, Hübner, An der Alster 84 20099 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01943215.2 | 03.04.2001 | [2002/08] | WO2001EP03743 | Priority number, date | DE2000116575 | 03.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10016575 | [2002/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0175333 | Date: | 11.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1180222 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16H9/10, F16H55/54 | [2002/08] | CPC: |
F16H9/24 (EP);
F16H55/54 (EP);
F16H9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/08] | Title | German: | STUFENLOSES GETRIEBE | [2002/08] | English: | CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE GEAR | [2002/08] | French: | TRANSMISSION CONTINUE VARIABLE | [2002/08] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2455483 (HARRY GEOFFREY M) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,12 * column 6, line 15 - column 7, line 17 * * figures 2-8 * [A] 4,11; | [XA]DE959073 (VÖHRINGER, LUDWIG) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,12 * page 2, column L, line 17 - line 36 * * page 3, column R, line 87 - page 4, column L, line 38 * * figures 3,4,6,7 * [A] 4,11; | [A]EP0611000 (STORK RMS BV) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | - Dubbel: Taschenbuch für den Maschinenbau, 18. Auflage, page 109FF |