EP1286642 - MASSAGE APPARATUS COMPRISING AT LEAST A ROLLER DRIVEN POSITIVELY IN ROTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guitay, Louis-Paul L'Err de Crans, 5 Rue du Prado 3963 Crans-Sur-Sierre / CH | [2004/34] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states Guitay, Louis-Paul Résidence du Soleil A 3963 Crans-Sur-Sierre / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras B.P. 32 20, rue Louis Chirpaz 69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | ||
Former [2003/10] | Vuillermoz, Bruno Cabinet Laurent & Charras B.P. 32 20, rue Louis Chirpaz 69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01943568.4 | 06.06.2001 | [2003/10] | WO2001FR01739 | Priority number, date | FR20000007399 | 09.06.2000 Original published format: FR 0007399 | [2003/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0193799 | Date: | 13.12.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1286642 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1286642 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61H15/00, A61H9/00 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
A61H9/005 (EP,US);
A61H15/00 (KR);
A61H15/0085 (EP,US);
A61H7/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/10] | Extension states | AL | 14.11.2002 | LT | 14.11.2002 | LV | 14.11.2002 | MK | 14.11.2002 | RO | 14.11.2002 | SI | 14.11.2002 | Title | German: | MASSAGEGERÄT MIT MINDESTENS EINER DIREKT ANGETRIEBENEN WALZE | [2003/10] | English: | MASSAGE APPARATUS COMPRISING AT LEAST A ROLLER DRIVEN POSITIVELY IN ROTATION | [2003/10] | French: | APPAREIL DE MASSAGE COMPORTANT AU MOINS UN ROULEAU ENTRAINE POSITIVEMENT EN ROTATION | [2003/10] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 13.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | Printing Pack B.V. Strawinskylaan 3051 Amsterdam 1077 ZX / NL | Date: | 18.06.2004 | ID: | 01 01/exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | LPG SYSTEMS Technoparc de la Plaine, 30 rue du Docteur Abel 26000 Valence / FR | Date: | 18.06.2004 |
Former [2004/40] | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Licencee: | Printing Pack Holding B.V. Locatellikade 1 Parnassustoren 1076 / NL | ||
Date: | 18.06.2004 | ||
ID: | 01 01/exclusive | ||
For: | all designated states | ||
Licencee: | LPG SYSTEMS Technoparc de la Plaine, 30 rue du Docteur Abel 26000 Valence / FR | ||
Date: | 18.06.2004 | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.06.2005 | [2007/20] | Cited in | International search | [A]FR727291 (HEINRICH STANGER) [A] 14* the whole document *; | [DA]FR2579100 (GUITAY LOUIS PAUL [FR]) [DA] 3 * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 2; figure - *; | [DY]EP0224422 (GUITAY LOUIS PAUL) [DY] 1,3-5,13 * abstract *; | [YA]WO9421210 (BELLANDI GUISEPPE [IT]) [Y] 1,3-5,13 * page 9, paragraphs 1,3; figures 1,4,5 * * page 11, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 1 * [A] 6; | [Y]FR2749755 (WERKAMP RICHTER REGINALD [FR]) [Y] 5 * abstract *; | [A]US5711758 (TSENG JAMES [TW]) [A] 1,6 * column A; figure - * | by applicant | US901787 | FR409202 | CH168279 | US2574601 | FR1225094 | US3297024 | FR1590131 | FR2579100 |