EP1292988 - Method of operating light-emitting devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/12] | LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICES | ||
[2009/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cambridge Display Technology Limited Building 2020 Cambourne Business Park Cambridgeshire, CB3 6DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Cambridge Display Technology Limited Building 2020, Cambourne Business Park Cambridgeshire, CB3 6DW / GB | ||
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Cambridge Display Technology Limited Building 2020, Cambourne Business Park Cambridgeshire, CB3 6DW / GB | ||
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states Cambridge Display Technology Limited Greenwich House, Madingley Rise, Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0TX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONGMAN, Jan, c/o Cambridge Display Technology Ltd Greenwich House, Madingley Rise, Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0HJ / GB | 02 /
ALTRIP, John, c/o Cambridge Display Technology Ltd Greenwich House, Madingley Rise, Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0HJ / GB | 03 /
LACEY, David, c/o Cambridge Display Technology Ltd Greenwich House, Madingley Rise, Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0HJ / GB | [2003/12] | Application number, filing date | 01943610.4 | 21.06.2001 | [2003/12] | WO2001GB02732 | Priority number, date | GB20000015327 | 23.06.2000 Original published format: GB 0015327 | GB20000022937 | 19.09.2000 Original published format: GB 0022937 | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0199195 | Date: | 27.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1292988 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1292988 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/15, H01L27/32 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
H10K59/352 (EP,US);
H10K50/125 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/3208 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/805 (KR,US);
H10K59/35 (KR);
H10K59/353 (EP,US);
H10K85/00 (EP,KR);
G09G2300/0452 (EP,KR,US);
H10K2102/301 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2003/12] | H01L27/15 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Betriebsverfahren für lichtemittierende Vorrichtungen | [2009/52] | English: | Method of operating light-emitting devices | [2009/52] | French: | Procédé de fonctionnement des dispositifs luminescents | [2009/52] |
Former [2003/12] | LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNGEN | ||
Former [2003/12] | LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICES | ||
Former [2003/12] | DISPOSITIFS LUMINESCENTS | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 25.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06006481.3 / EP1686625 | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 30.09.2004 | [2005/13] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.05.2010 | BE | 05.05.2010 | CY | 05.05.2010 | DK | 05.05.2010 | FI | 05.05.2010 | IT | 05.05.2010 | SE | 05.05.2010 | TR | 05.05.2010 | IE | 21.06.2010 | LU | 21.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | FR | 05.07.2010 | GR | 06.08.2010 | ES | 16.08.2010 | PT | 06.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 21.06.2010 | ||
LU | 21.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 05.07.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 21.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 05.07.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 21.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 21.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | ES | 16.08.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH1039791 ; | [X]JPH11111457 ; | [XA]JPH11162233 ; | [PX]JP2000235891 ; | [A]WO9942983 (CAMBRIDGE DISPLAY TECH LTD [GB], et al); | [PXPA]EP1024399 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) |