EP1305619 - METHOD FOR THE ANALYSIS OF A SELECTED MULTICOMPONENT SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pattern Recognition Systems Holding AS Bergen High-technology Centre, Thormahlensgate 55 5008 Bergen / NO | [2003/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KVALHEIM, Olav, Pattern Recognition System AG Bergrn High-technology Centre, Thorm hlensgate 55 5008 Bergen / NO | 02 /
GRUNG, Bj rn, Pattern Recognition Systems AS Bergen High-technology Centre, Thorm hlensgate 55 5008 Bergen / NO | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Power, Philippa Louise Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Power, Philippa Louise Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01943698.9 | 04.07.2001 | [2003/18] | WO2001GB02960 | Priority number, date | GB20000016459 | 04.07.2000 Original published format: GB 0016459 | [2003/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0203056 | Date: | 10.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1305619 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/72 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
G01N30/8624 (EP,US);
G01N30/72 (EP,US);
G01N30/8606 (EP);
G01N30/8631 (EP,US);
G01N30/8662 (EP,US);
G01N30/8679 (EP);
G01N30/8693 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/18] | Extension states | AL | 31.01.2003 | LT | 31.01.2003 | LV | 31.01.2003 | MK | 31.01.2003 | RO | 31.01.2003 | SI | 31.01.2003 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE EINER BESTIMMTEN AUS MEHRKOMPONENTEN BESTEHENDEN PROBE | [2003/18] | English: | METHOD FOR THE ANALYSIS OF A SELECTED MULTICOMPONENT SAMPLE | [2003/18] | French: | PROCEDE POUR L'ANALYSE D'UN ECHANTILLON SELECTIONNE A COMPOSANTS MULTIPLES | [2003/18] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 01.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/31] | 08.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.01.2004 | 31.07.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2004 | 31.07.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5602755 (ASHE TERRENCE R [CA], et al) [X] 1-7,15-20 * column 1, line 50 - column 4, line 67; figure 1; example - * [Y] 8-14; | [X]US5699269 (ASHE TERRENCE RODNEY [CA], et al) [X] 1-7,15-20 * figure 8; example 1 *; | [A]DE19522774 (IFU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7,15-20 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 25; figure - *; | [A]FR2774768 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [A] 1-6,15-20 * page 4, line 21 - page 15, line 30; claim 1 *; | [DYA] - MANNE R ET AL, "Resolution of two-way data from hyphenated chromatography by means of elementary matrix transformations", CHEMOMETRICS AND INTELLIGEMT LABORATORY SYSTEMS, ISSN 0169-7439, (200001), vol. 50, no. 1, pages 35 - 46, XP004184175 [DY] 8-14 * the whole document * [A] 1-5,15-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-7439(99)00042-8 | [A] - BRAKSTAD F, "The feasibility of latent variables applied to GC-MS data", CHEMOMETRICS AND INTELLIGENT LABORATORY SYSTEMS, ISSN 0169-7439, (199510), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 157 - 176, XP004037860 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7439(95)00046-3 | [PX] - EIDE I ET AL, "Resolution of GC-MS data of complex PAC mixtures and regression modeling of mutagenicity by PLS", ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, ISSN 0013-936X, (200106), vol. 35, no. 11, pages 2314 - 2318, XP002178703 [PX] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/es000154e |