EP1312158 - TRANSMITTER INCLUDING A COMPOSIT AMPLIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELLBERG, Richard Forellvägen 14, 3tr S-141 47 Huddinge / SE | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Mrazek, Werner, et al Aros Patent AB P.O. Box 1544 751 45 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Mrazek, Werner, et al Aros Patent AB P.O. Box 1544 751 45 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 01944023.9 | 19.06.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001SE01392 | Priority number, date | SE20000002584 | 07.07.2000 Original published format: SE 0002584 | SE20010000063 | 10.01.2001 Original published format: SE 0100063 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0205420 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1312158 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1312158 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 17.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/02, H04B1/02 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
H03F3/24 (EP,US);
H03F1/0288 (EP,US);
H03F2200/168 (EP,US);
H03F2200/451 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENDER MIT EINEM ZUSAMMENSETZUNGSVERSTÄRKER | [2003/21] | English: | TRANSMITTER INCLUDING A COMPOSIT AMPLIFIER | [2003/21] | French: | EMETTEUR COMPRENANT UN AMPLIFICATEUR COMPOSITE | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 07.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 26.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.01.2008 | BE | 23.01.2008 | CH | 23.01.2008 | CY | 23.01.2008 | DK | 23.01.2008 | FI | 23.01.2008 | IT | 23.01.2008 | LI | 23.01.2008 | NL | 23.01.2008 | TR | 23.01.2008 | SE | 23.04.2008 | DE | 24.04.2008 | GR | 24.04.2008 | IE | 19.06.2008 | LU | 19.06.2008 | PT | 23.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
TR | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
DE | 24.04.2008 | ||
IE | 19.06.2008 | ||
LU | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
DE | 24.04.2008 | ||
IE | 19.06.2008 | ||
LU | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
DE | 24.04.2008 | ||
IE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
DE | 24.04.2008 | ||
IE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
DE | 24.04.2008 | ||
IE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
DE | 24.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 23.01.2008 | |
LI | 23.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6008694 (EL-SHARAWY EL-BADAWY AMIEN [US]); | [A]US6085074 (CYGAN LAWRENCE F [US]); | [A]US6097252 (SIGMON BERNARD EUGENE [US], et al); | [A]US6128478 (KIM KEVIN [US]) |