EP1294227 - TRANSGENIC MICE CONTAINING NUCLEAR HORMONE RECEPTOR GENE DISRUPTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deltagen, Inc. 740 Bay Road Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2003/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUENTHER, Catherine 731 Chestnut Street San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 02 /
BRENNAN, Thomas, J. 325 Rockwood Drive South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2003/13] | Representative(s) | Furlong, Isla Jane D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Furlong, Isla Jane D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01944534.5 | 14.06.2001 | [2003/13] | WO2001US19209 | Priority number, date | US20000211885P | 14.06.2000 Original published format: US 211885 P | US20000223464P | 07.08.2000 Original published format: US 223464 P | US20000252300P | 20.11.2000 Original published format: US 252300 P | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0195711 | Date: | 20.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1294227 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/027, C07K14/705, C12N15/90, C12N5/10, A61K49/00, G01N33/50 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
C12N15/8509 (EP,US);
A01K67/0276 (EP,US);
A61K49/0008 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
C07K14/70567 (EP,US);
C07K14/72 (EP,US);
A01K2217/072 (EP,US);
A01K2217/075 (EP,US);
A01K2217/20 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
A01K2267/03 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSGENE MÄUSE MIT FEHLENDER EXPRESSION VON GENE, DIE FÜR ZELLKERN HORMONREZEPTOREN KODIEREN | [2003/13] | English: | TRANSGENIC MICE CONTAINING NUCLEAR HORMONE RECEPTOR GENE DISRUPTIONS | [2003/13] | French: | SOURIS TRANSGENIQUES CONTENANT DES MODIFICATIONS DE GENE DE RECEPTEUR HORMONAL NUCLEAIRE | [2003/13] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.01.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 04.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/28] | 09.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9426100 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR], et al) [X] 1-15,30,31,35 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO9635785 (KAROBIO AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-15,30,31,35 * claims 1,7,8 *; | [X]US5650550 (KORACH KENNETH S [US], et al) [X] 1-15,30,31,35 * example 1 *; | [A]WO9915555 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-38 * claims 1,3 *; | [E]WO0151045 (TULARIK INC [US], et al) [E] 1-15,30,31,35 * example 6 *; | [E]WO0225270 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US], et al) [E] 1-15,30,31,35 * claims 3-5 *; | [PX] - WEI P ET AL, "THE NUCLEAR RECEPTOR CAR MEDIATES SPECIFIC XENOBIOTIC INDUCTION OF DRUG METABOLISM", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, (20001019), vol. 407, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 920 - 923, XP000999432 [PX] 1-15,30,31,35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35038112 | [AD] - CHOI H ET AL, "Differential transactivation by two isoforms of the orphan nuclear hormone receptor CAR", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY., (19970919), vol. 272, no. 38, pages 23565 - 23571, XP002203191 [AD] 1-38 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.38.23565 |