EP1296859 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RECOGNITION OF A COLLISION WITH A PEDESTRIAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/46] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTES, Bernhard Querstrasse 41 74343 Sachsenheim / DE | 02 /
FLIK, Gottfried Einsteinstrasse 35 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2003/14] | Application number, filing date | 01944963.6 | 31.05.2001 | [2003/14] | WO2001DE02062 | Priority number, date | DE2000130465 | 21.06.2000 Original published format: DE 10030465 | [2003/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0198117 | Date: | 27.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1296859 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1296859 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/34 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
B60R21/013 (EP,US);
B60R21/0136 (EP,US);
B60R21/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [2004/20] |
Former [2003/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERKENNEN EINES FUSSGANGERAUFPRALLS | [2003/14] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RECOGNITION OF A COLLISION WITH A PEDESTRIAN | [2003/14] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR IDENTIFIER UN IMPACT DU A UN PIETON | [2003/14] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 06.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 16.11.2005 | GB | 16.11.2005 | SE | 16.02.2006 | ES | 27.02.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/10] | GB | 16.11.2005 | |
SE | 16.02.2006 | ||
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | SE | 16.02.2006 | |
ES | 27.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | SE | 16.02.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO9718108 (SECR DEFENCE [GB], et al) [XD] 1,4-6 * page 5, paragraphs 2,5 *; | [X]JPH11310095 ; | [X]JPH08216826 ; | [X]JP2000025562 ; | [A]DE2821156 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) [A] 1,5,6 * page 4, paragraph 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11310095 A 19991109 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES &DEV LAB INC) [X] 1,6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, & JP08216826 A 19960827 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000025562 A 20000125 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES &DEV LAB INC) [X] 1,6 * abstract * |