EP1289420 - METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING A PERSON AMONG A POPULATION BY SENSING HIS FINGERPRINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAGEM Sécurité Le Ponant de Paris 27, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2007/51] |
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states SAGEM Défense Sécurité Le Ponant de Paris 27 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states SAGEM SA 6, Avenue d'Iéna 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHASTEL, Pierre 2, allée des Fougères F-77780 Bourron-Marlotte / FR | 02 /
FONDEUR, Jean-Christophe 25, rue de Villiers F-92200 Neuilly / FR | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Gorrée, Jean-Michel Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Gorrée, Jean-Michel Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2003/11] | Gorree, Jean-Michel 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01945421.4 | 13.06.2001 | [2003/11] | WO2001FR01838 | Priority number, date | FR20000007707 | 16.06.2000 Original published format: FR 0007707 | [2003/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0195804 | Date: | 20.12.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1289420 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1289420 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/117 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
A61B5/1172 (EP,US);
G06V40/117 (EP,US);
G06V40/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINER PERSON DURCH FINGERABDRUCKERKENNUNG | [2003/11] | English: | METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING A PERSON AMONG A POPULATION BY SENSING HIS FINGERPRINTS | [2003/11] | French: | PROCEDE POUR IDENTIFIER UNE PERSONNE PARMI UNE POPULATION PAR DETECTION DE SES EMPREINTES DIGITALES | [2003/11] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 06.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.03.2009 | CY | 11.03.2009 | DK | 11.03.2009 | FI | 11.03.2009 | IE | 11.03.2009 | IT | 11.03.2009 | TR | 11.03.2009 | SE | 11.06.2009 | GR | 12.06.2009 | LU | 13.06.2009 | ES | 22.06.2009 | BE | 30.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | PT | 24.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
LU | 13.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
BE | 30.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | FI | 11.03.2009 | |
SE | 11.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2674051 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [A] 1* page 6, line 8 - line 23 *; | [A]WO9840962 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1 * page 12, line 18 - page 13, line 4 * |