EP1290435 - DETECTING LYING DEFECTS ON METAL PRODUCTS BY NON-DESTRUCTIVE ULTRASONIC CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/11] | DETECTING SUBHORIZONTAL DEFECTS ON METAL PRODUCTS BY NON-DESTRUCTIVE ULTRASONIC CONTROL | ||
[2017/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALLOUREC & MANNESMANN TUBES 130 Rue de Silly 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2005/19] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states Setval 130, rue de Silly 92100 Boulogne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISIAUX, Bernard 3, résidence Marin la Meslée 59300 Valenciennes / FR | 02 /
DETOURNAY, Michèle 5, allée de la Brie 91090 Lisses / FR | [2017/24] |
Former [2003/11] | 01 /
BISIAUX, Bernard 3, résidence Marin la Meslée F-59300 Valenciennes / FR | ||
02 /
DETOURNAY, Michèle 5, allée de la Brie F-91090 Lisses / FR | Representative(s) | Marsolais, Richard Vallourec Tubes DPI 12 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/24] | Plaçais, Jean Yves Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/11] | Plaçais, Jean-Yves Cabinet Netter, 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01945441.2 | 14.06.2001 | [2003/11] | WO2001FR01860 | Priority number, date | FR20000007729 | 16.06.2000 Original published format: FR 0007729 | [2003/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0196855 | Date: | 20.12.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1290435 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1290435 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/44 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
G01N29/4427 (EP);
G01N29/11 (EP);
G01N29/225 (EP);
G01N29/38 (EP);
G01N29/4472 (EP);
G01N2291/0234 (EP);
G01N2291/02854 (EP);
G01N2291/0421 (EP);
G01N2291/0422 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2003/11] | G01N29/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2017/24] |
Former [2003/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | ZERSTÖRUNGSFREIE ULTRASCHALLPRÜFUNG VON LIEGENDEN FEHLERN IN METALLISCHEN PRODUKTEN | [2017/05] | English: | DETECTING LYING DEFECTS ON METAL PRODUCTS BY NON-DESTRUCTIVE ULTRASONIC CONTROL | [2017/05] | French: | DETECTION DE DEFAUTS COUCHES SUR PRODUITS METALLIQUES EN CONTROLE NON DESTRUCTIF PAR ULTRASONS | [2003/11] |
Former [2003/11] | ZERSTÖRUNGSFREIE ULTRASCHALLPRÜFUNG VON GESTRECKTEN SCHALEN IN METALLISCHEN PRODUKTEN | ||
Former [2003/11] | DETECTING SUBHORIZONTAL DEFECTS ON METAL PRODUCTS BY NON-DESTRUCTIVE ULTRASONIC CONTROL | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 21.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2017 | CY | 14.06.2017 | DK | 14.06.2017 | ES | 14.06.2017 | FI | 14.06.2017 | IE | 14.06.2017 | IT | 14.06.2017 | LU | 14.06.2017 | MC | 14.06.2017 | NL | 14.06.2017 | PT | 14.06.2017 | SE | 14.06.2017 | TR | 14.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | GR | 15.09.2017 | [2020/28] |
Former [2020/15] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3614002 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 11 - page 12, line 14; figure 2 *; | [A]GB2059061 (ELECTRIC POWER RES INST) [A] 1,4 * claims 1,6 *; | [A]GB2075678 (KRAUTKRAEMER GMBH) [A] 1 * page 1, line 59 - page 2, line 13; figures 2A,2B *; | [A]FR2436393 (KRAUTKRAEMER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,8 * pages 1-6; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2704132 (MANNESMANN AG) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5280723 (AHARONI ABRAHAM [IL], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 53 *; | [A]US4799168 (SARR DENNIS P [US]) [A] 8 * column 2, line 62 - column 4, line 41; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2670583 (VALTUBES [FR]) [A] 1,7 * page 13, line 24 - page 17, line 29 *; | [A]FR2471584 (SIDERURGIE FSE INST RECH [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 39 - page 4, line 34; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE3614002 | GB2075678 | FR2471584 |