EP1299019 - SUPPORT ARRANGEMENT FOR GOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/15] | AN ARRANGEMENT IN A SUPPORTING DEVICE FOR GOODS | ||
[2005/11] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Revocation of patent | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HL DISPLAY AB Horisontvägen 26 128 34 Skarpnäck / SE | [2003/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDEN, Henrik Gudmundsbyn 5681 S-857 51 Sundsvall / SE | 02 /
JOSEFSSON, Börje Box 810 S-851 23 Sundsvall / SE | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Axelsson, Rolf, et al Kransell & Wennborg KB Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Axelsson, Rolf, et al Kransell & Wennborg AB Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 01945877.7 | 02.07.2001 | [2003/15] | WO2001SE01522 | Priority number, date | SE20000002579 | 07.07.2000 Original published format: SE 0002579 | [2003/15] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0203836 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1299019 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1299019 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 17.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47F1/12, A47F5/00 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
A47F1/12 (EP,US);
A47F5/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 19.12.2002 | LV | 19.12.2002 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGANORDUNUNG FÜR WAREN | [2003/15] | English: | SUPPORT ARRANGEMENT FOR GOODS | [2005/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR SUPPORT DE MARCHANDISES | [2003/15] |
Former [2003/15] | AN ARRANGEMENT IN A SUPPORTING DEVICE FOR GOODS | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2001 | Translation filed | 19.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 19.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/15] | 13.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2005
ADMISSIBLE JOALPE INDUSTRIA DE EXPOSITORES S.A. Zona Industrial do Tortosendo, Iote 43 PT-6200 TORTOSENDO / PT Opponent's representative Duthoit, Michel Georges André, et al, et al Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 96/98, Boulevard Carnot B.P. 105 59027 Lille Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2005
ADMISSIBLE JOALPE INDUSTRIA DE EXPOSITORES S.A. Zona Industrial do Tortosendo, Iote 43 PT-6200 TORTOSENDO / PT Opponent's representative Duthoit, Michel Georges André, et al, et al Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés, 96/98, Boulevard Carnot, B.P. 105 59027 Lille Cedex / FR | 01.02.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.08.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.09.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.10.2007 | 04.09.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 17.09.2007 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/07] | 08.10.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.03.2005 | CH | 23.03.2005 | FI | 23.03.2005 | LI | 23.03.2005 | TR | 23.03.2005 | DK | 23.06.2005 | GR | 23.06.2005 | SE | 23.06.2005 | CY | 02.07.2005 | LU | 02.07.2005 | IE | 04.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
CY | 02.07.2005 | ||
LU | 02.07.2005 | ||
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
CY | 02.07.2005 | ||
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 23.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3211880 (VALKIESER HANS HELMUT); | [A]WO9214389 (RETAIL ADVERSITING LTD [GB]); | [A]DE9210275U ; | [A]US5413229 (ZUBERBUHLER H RICHARD [US], et al); | [AE]WO0048488 (HL DISPLAY AB [SE], et al) |