EP1292337 - MULTIVALENT PLATFORM MOLECULES COMPRISING HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYETHYLENE OXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LA JOLLA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY 6455 Nancy Ridge Drive, Suite 300 San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2006/23] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states LA JOLLA PHARMACEUTICAL 6455 Nancy Ridge Drive, Suite 300 San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, David, S. 11265 Florindo Road San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. Gray's Inn 14 South Square London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01946145.8 | 07.06.2001 | [2003/12] | WO2001US18446 | Priority number, date | US20000210439P | 08.06.2000 Original published format: US 210439 P | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0193914 | Date: | 13.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1292337 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
A61K47/54 (EP,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,US);
A61P7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYETHYLENOXID MIT HOHEM MOLEKULARGEWICHT ENTHALTENDE MULTIVALENZ-PLATTFORMMOLEKÜLE | [2003/12] | English: | MULTIVALENT PLATFORM MOLECULES COMPRISING HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYETHYLENE OXIDE | [2003/12] | French: | MOLECULES A PLATE-FORME POLYVALENTES COMPRENANT UN POLY(ETHYLENE OXYDE) DE POIDS MOLECULAIRE ELEVE | [2003/12] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 24.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/26] | 06.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/26] | Request for further processing for: | 17.08.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.09.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]WO0075105 (JOLLA PHARMA [US], et al) [XP] 1-34 * claims 1-53 * * page 23, line 28 - page 24, line 24 *; | [PAD]WO0034231 (JOLLA PHARMA [US], et al) [PAD] 1-34 * figures 4-30 * * claims 1-46 *; | [PAD]WO0034296 (JOLLA PHARMA [US], et al) [PAD] 1-34 * claims 1-15 * * figures 4-15 *; | [Y]WO9964595 (JOLLA PHARMA [US], et al) [Y] 1-34 * claims 1,8-20 *; | [YD]US5990237 (BENTLEY MICHAEL D [US], et al) [YD] 1-34 * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 2 * * claims 1-23 *; | [Y]EP0642798 (JOLLA PHARMA [CA]) [Y] 1-24 * claims 1-22 * * figures 6,7 *; | [D]US5552391 (COUTTS STEPHEN M [US], et al); | [YD]WO9945964 (SHEARWATER POLYMERS INC [US], et al) [YD] 1-24 * claims 1-48 * * page 8, line 16 - line 33 *; | [A]WO9621469 (SHEARWATER POLYMERS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * claims 1-43 *; | [D]US5932462 (HARRIS MILTON J [US], et al) |