EP1305021 - RAPIDLY EXPANDING COMPOSITION FOR GASTRIC RETENTION AND CONTROLLED RELEASE OF THERAPEUTIC AGENTS, AND DOSAGE FORMS INCLUDING THE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5 Basel Street, P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 5 Basel Street, P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLESHNER-BARAK, Moshe Hefetz Mordechai 15 Petach Tikva / IL | 02 /
LERNER, E., Itzhak Wolfson 32 Petach Tikva / IL | 03 /
ROSENBERGER, Vered Ms. Landau 3 Givat Masuah Jerusalem / IL | 04 /
DAHAN, Mazal Moshe Sharet Street 8/10 96920 Jerusalem / IL | 05 /
IMAKOV, Yisrael Ha Narkiss 20 Carmei Yosef / IL | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Gallagher, Kirk James, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Gallagher, Kirk James, et al D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01946709.1 | 22.06.2001 | [2003/18] | WO2001US20134 | Priority number, date | US20000213832P | 23.06.2000 Original published format: US 213832 P | US20000217110P | 10.07.2000 Original published format: US 217110 P | US20000223212P | 04.08.2000 Original published format: US 223212 P | [2003/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0200213 | Date: | 03.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1305021 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/24, A61K9/20, A61K9/28, A61K9/14, A61K9/16 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
A61K9/0065 (EP);
B82B3/00 (KR);
A61K31/663 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNELL AUSDEHNENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR VERZÖGERUNG IM MAGEN UND KONTROLLIERTE FREISETZUNG VON WIRKSTOFFEN, UND DIESE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTENDE DARREICHUNGSFORMEN | [2003/18] | English: | RAPIDLY EXPANDING COMPOSITION FOR GASTRIC RETENTION AND CONTROLLED RELEASE OF THERAPEUTIC AGENTS, AND DOSAGE FORMS INCLUDING THE COMPOSITION | [2003/18] | French: | COMPOSITION A EXPANSION RAPIDE POUR RETENTION GASTRIQUE ET LIBERATION REGULEE D'AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES, ET FORMES POSOLOGIQUES RENFERMANT CETTE COMPOSITION | [2003/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.01.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 16.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/29] | 01.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4140755 (SHETH PRABHAKAR R, et al) [DA] 1-43 * example 1; claim - *; | [A]EP0795324 (JAGOTEC AG [CH]) [A] 1-43* claim - *; | [A]WO9904764 (PERIO PROD LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-43 * claim 24 * | International search | [Y]US4140755 (SHETH PRABHAKAR R, et al); | [Y]US4167558 (SHETH PRABHAKAR R, et al); | [Y]US4434153 (URQUHART JOHN [US], et al) |