EP1285185 - METHOD FOR MODIFYING A DEFINED ADAPTIVE DRIVING STRATEGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENNEKEN, Markus Betznauer Strasse 12 88079 Kressbronn / DE | 02 /
JAUCH, Friedemann Am Bach 22 88069 Tettnang / DE | 03 /
HERBSTER, Kai-Uwe Tannenweg 57 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | 04 /
SCHULER, Franz-Josef Untermühleweg 14 88079 Kressbronn / DE | 05 /
MAUZ, Thomas Rosenstrasse 31 88085 Langenargen / DE | [2003/18] |
Former [2003/14] | 01 /
HENNEKEN, Markus Betznauer Strasse 12 88079 Kressbronn / DE | ||
02 /
JAUCH, Friedemann Ginsterweg 18 88074 Meckenbeuren / DE | |||
03 /
HERBSTER, Kai-Uwe Tannenweg 57 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | |||
04 /
SCHULER, Franz-Josef Untermühleweg 14 88079 Kressbronn / DE | |||
05 /
MAUZ, Thomas Rosenstrasse 31 88085 Langenargen / DE | |||
Former [2003/09] | 01 /
HENNEKEN, Markus Betznauer Strasse 12 88079 Kressbronn / DE | ||
02 /
JAUCH, Friedemann Ginsterweg 18 88074 Meckenbeuren / DE | |||
03 /
HERBSTER, Kai-Uwe Tannenweg 57 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | |||
04 /
SCHULER, Franz-Josef Untermühleweg 14 88079 Kressbronn / DE | |||
05 /
MAUZ, Thomas Goethestrasse 47 88079 Kressbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 01947255.4 | 04.05.2001 | [2003/09] | WO2001EP05076 | Priority number, date | DE2000122610 | 09.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10022610 | [2003/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0186175 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1285185 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1285185 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
F16H61/0213 (EP,US);
F16H61/02 (KR);
F16H2059/003 (EP,US);
F16H2059/086 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0225 (EP,US);
F16H59/141 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/22] |
Former [2003/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERÄNDERUNG EINER DEFINIERTEN ADAPTIVEN FAHRSTRATEGIE | [2003/09] | English: | METHOD FOR MODIFYING A DEFINED ADAPTIVE DRIVING STRATEGY | [2003/09] | French: | PROCEDE POUR MODIFIER UNE STRATEGIE DE CONDUITE ADAPTATIVE DEFINIE | [2003/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 10.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 03.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03] | Request for further processing for: | 03.12.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 03.12.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.12.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0950839 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [X] 1,3,8 * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 14; figure 1; claims 1,4,5,8 *; | [XA]DE19752623 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 68 - page 3, line 14 * * page 5, line 2 - line 6 * [A] 23; | [X]US5467277 (FUJISAWA MASAAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 8, line 56 - column 11, line 9 * * column 12, line 14 - line 41 * * figures 9-13,18 *; | [A]US5157609 (STEHLE HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,7,11 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 14; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [D]DE3922051 (PORSCHE AG [DE], et al); | [A]EP0638742 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 3,11 * figure 1; claims 1,2,4 * | by applicant | DE3922051 |