EP1305266 - USE OF A FIRED REFRACTORY CERAMIC SHAPED PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Refractory Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Wienerbergstraße 11 1100 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states Refractory Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Wienerbergstrasse 11 1100 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEITH, Martin 19, Otto Krischkegasse A-8720 Knittelfeld / AT | 02 /
TRUMMER, Bernd 21, Rottalgasse A-8010 Graz / AT | 03 /
BUCHBERGER, Bernd 40, Neubaugasse A-8793 Trofaiach / AT | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Becker, Thomas Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Becker, Thomas U., Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. Becker & Dr. Müller, Berkenbrink, Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01947322.2 | 26.05.2001 | [2003/18] | WO2001EP06024 | Priority number, date | DE20001035728 | 22.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10035728 | [2003/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0208149 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1305266 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1305266 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/66, C04B41/50 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
C04B41/5089 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES GEBRANNTEN FEUERFESTEN KERAMISCHEN FORMTEILS | [2003/18] | English: | USE OF A FIRED REFRACTORY CERAMIC SHAPED PART | [2003/18] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN CORPS MOULE CERAMIQUE CUIT REFRACTAIRE | [2003/18] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 05.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 20.10.2004 | IE | 20.10.2004 | NL | 20.10.2004 | TR | 20.10.2004 | DK | 20.01.2005 | SE | 20.01.2005 | PT | 20.03.2005 | CY | 26.05.2005 | LU | 26.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/27] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
SE | 20.01.2005 | ||
CY | 26.05.2005 | ||
LU | 26.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
SE | 20.01.2005 | ||
CY | 26.05.2005 | ||
LU | 26.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
SE | 20.01.2005 | ||
CY | 26.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
SE | 20.01.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 20.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0742187 (HALDENWANGER TECH KERAMIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * page 4, line 18 - line 35; claim 1 * * page 5, line 55 - page 6, line 9 *; | [A]EP0816305 (SHERA WERKSTOFFTECHNOLOGIE GMB [DE]) [A] 1* page 3, line 43 - page 4, line 29 *; | [X]DE19919401 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 58 - page 3, line 67 * * page 5, line 30 - line 33 * |