EP1417767 - HYBRID DIMENSIONAL, SPHERICAL SPACE-TIME CODING AND DECODING APPARATUS, AND ASSOCIATED METHOD, FOR A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2006 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2004/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERRY, John 1402 Blakes Way Garland, TX 75042 / US | 02 /
HEISKALA, Juha 9486 Valley Ranch Parkway, Apt. 2081 Irving, TX 75063 / US | 03 /
SRINIVASAN, Radha 23028 Arlington Avenue 12 Torrance, California 90501 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2004/20] | 01 /
TERRY, John 1402 Blakes Way Garland, TX 75042 / US | ||
02 /
HEISKALA, Juha 9486 Valley Ranch Parkway, Apt. 2081 Irving, TX 75063 / US | |||
03 /
SRINIVASAN, Radha 23028 Arlington Avenue #12 Torrance, California 90501 / US | Representative(s) | Henningsson, Gunnar AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | Henningsson, Gunnar AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 01947720.7 | 12.07.2001 | [2004/20] | WO2001IB01242 | Priority number, date | US20000619824 | 20.07.2000 Original published format: US 619824 | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0209293 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1417767 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/00 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
H04L1/006 (EP,US);
H04L1/0069 (EP,US);
H04L1/0071 (EP,US);
H04L1/0618 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/20] | Title | German: | MEHRFACHDIMENSIONALE, SPHERISCHE RAUM-ZEIT-CODIERUNG UND DECODIERGERÄT, UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN FÜR EIN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2004/20] | English: | HYBRID DIMENSIONAL, SPHERICAL SPACE-TIME CODING AND DECODING APPARATUS, AND ASSOCIATED METHOD, FOR A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2004/20] | French: | PROC D ET DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE/D CODAGE HYBRIDE SPATIO-TEMPOREL SPH RIQUE POUR SYST ME DE T L COMMUNICATIONS | [2004/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.06.2003 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 15.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/51] | 01.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.06.2003 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.2003 | 03.06.2003 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.2003 | 03.06.2003 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.2003 | 03.06.2003 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.2003 | 03.06.2003 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.2003 | 03.06.2003 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.2003 | 03.06.2003 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.2003 | 03.06.2003 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.2003 | 03.06.2003 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.2003 | 03.06.2003 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.2003 | 03.06.2003 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.2003 | 03.06.2003 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.2003 | 03.06.2003 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.2003 | 03.06.2003 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.2003 | 03.06.2003 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.2003 | 03.06.2003 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.2003 | 03.06.2003 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.2003 | 03.06.2003 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.2003 | 03.06.2003 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.2003 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.06.2003 | M01   Fee paid on   03.06.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9945657 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1,12,15,16 * page 5, line 1 - page 16, line L; figure 1 *; | [A] - TAROKH V ET AL, "SPACE-TIME BLOCK CODING FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS: PERFORMANCE RESULSTS", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199903), vol. 17, no. 3, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 451 - 460, XP000804974 [A] 1,12,15,16 * abstract * * page 452, column 1, line 14 - line 40 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.753730 | [A] - TAROKH V ET AL, "Space-time codes for high data rate wireless communication: performance criterion and code construction", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19980301), vol. 44, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9448, pages 744 - 765, XP002089112 [A] 1,12,15,16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/18.661517 | [A] - SESHADRI N ET AL, "Space-time codes for wireless communication: code construction", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1997, IEEE 47TH PHOENIX, AZ, USA 4-7 MAY 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970504), ISBN 0-7803-3659-3, pages 637 - 641, XP010228920 [A] 1,12,15,16 * abstract * * page 637, column 1, line 21 - column 2, line 14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETEC.1997.600406 | [A] - TAROKH V ET AL, "Space-time codes for high data rate wireless communication: performance criteria", COMMUNICATIONS, 1997. ICC '97 MONTREAL, TOWARDS THE KNOWLEDGE MILLENNIUM. 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MONTREAL, QUE., CANADA 8-12 JUNE 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970608), ISBN 0-7803-3925-8, pages 299 - 303, XP010227134 [A] 1,12,15,16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.1997.605273 | [A] - WOLF J K ET AL, "P2 CODES: PRAGMATIC TRELLIS CODES UTILIZING PUNCTURED CONVOLUTIONALCODES", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER. PISCATAWAY, N.J, US, (19950201), vol. 33, no. 2, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 94 - 99, XP000505676 [A] 1,12,15,16 * page 94, column 1, line 1 - page 99, column 2, line L; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.350381 | [A] - VARANASI M K ET AL, "Complex spherical modulation for noncoherent communications", 2000 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON INFORMATION THEORY (CAT. NO.00CH37060), 2000 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON INFORMATION THEORY, SORRENTO, ITALY, 25-30 JUNE 2000, 2000, Piscataway, NJ, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-5857-0, page 163, XP002187442 [A] 1,12,15,16 * page 163, column 1, line 1 - column 2, line L * | [A] - WILSON S G ET AL, "FOUR-DIMENSIONAL MODULATION AND CODING: AN ALTERNATE TO FREQUENCY-REUSE", LINKS FOR THE FUTURE. AMSTERDAM, MAY 14 - 17, 1984, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, AMSTERDAM, NORTH-HOLLAND, NL, (198405), vol. 2, pages 919 - 923, XP000793854 [A] 1,12,15,16 * abstract * | [A] - WANG F-Q ET AL, "NEW ROTATIONALLY INVARIANT FOUR-DIMENSIONAL TRELLIS CODES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199601), vol. 42, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9448, pages 291 - 300, XP000823359 [A] 1,12,15,16 * page 291, column 1, line 1 - line 17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/18.481807 |