EP1302103 - METHOD OF CULTURING ZOOPLANKTON, APPARATUS FOR CULTURING BY THE SAME, AND CULTURE OBTAINED BY THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagase & Co., Ltd. 1-17, Shinmachi 1-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550-8668 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states Nagase & Co., Ltd. 1-17, Shinmachi 1-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-8668 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIMURA, Kenji 9-8, Hikarigaoka 2-chome Munakata-shi, Fukuoka 811-3403 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIMATSU, Takao 741-3, Teno, Okagaki-cho Onga-gun, Fukuoka 811-4204 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Kenji 1-1-201, Taga, Minami-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 815-0072 / JP | 04 /
KITAJIMA, Chikara 7-13, Yamadashin-machi 2-chome, Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 733-0853 / JP | 05 /
TANAKA, Shozo 8-36, Yoshizuka 4-chome, Hakata-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-0041 / JP | 06 /
SATO, Nobumitsu 1-1-1-1007, Doshodai, Suma-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 654-0122 / JP | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Koepe, Gerd L. Koepe & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Koepe, Gerd L., Dipl.-Chem. Koepe & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 22 12 64 80502 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01947834.6 | 04.07.2001 | [2003/16] | WO2001JP05824 | Priority number, date | JP20000205744 | 06.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000205744 | [2003/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0203786 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1302103 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A01K61/00, C12M3/00 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
A01K67/033 (EP,US);
C12M3/00 (KR);
A01K61/00 (EP);
A01K61/20 (EP,US);
A23K50/80 (EP,US);
Y02A40/81 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ZÜCHTEN VON ZOOPLANKTON, VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZÜCHTEN MIT DIESEM VERFAHREN UND MIT DIESEM VERFAHREN GEWONNENE KULTUR | [2003/16] | English: | METHOD OF CULTURING ZOOPLANKTON, APPARATUS FOR CULTURING BY THE SAME, AND CULTURE OBTAINED BY THE SAME | [2003/16] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE MISE EN CULTURE DE ZOOPLANCTON ET CULTURE OBTENUE | [2003/16] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2003 | Translation filed | 06.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 06.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 23.03.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS4826598 ; | [Y]JPS51135298 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS, et al); | [Y]JPS55138340 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [Y]JPS59227226 (MITSUI OCEAN DEV & ENG); | [Y]JPH01265880 (ORGANO KK); | [X]US5079168 (AMIOT BRUCE P [US]) |