EP1300790 - PAINT MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 1-2, Ooyodokita 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8511 / JP | [2006/32] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 1-2, Ooyodokita 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8511 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDO, Yoshio Nippon Paint Co., LTD.Tokyo Operations 1-15, Minamishinagawa 4-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-8675 / JP | 02 /
KAWABE, Toya Nippon Paint Co., LTD.Tokyo Operations 1-15, Minamishinagawa 4-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-8675 / JP | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Vinsome, Rex Martin, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Vinsome, Rex Martin, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Cale Cross House Pilgrim Street 156 Newcastle upon Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | ||
Former [2007/47] | Vinsome, Rex Martin, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | ||
Former [2003/15] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 01947974.0 | 11.07.2001 | [2003/15] | WO2001JP06015 | Priority number, date | JP20000211668 | 12.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000211668 | JP20010097052 | 29.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001097052 | [2003/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0205163 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1300790 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1300790 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q99/00, C09D7/14, C09D201/00 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
C09D7/00 (EP,US);
G06Q50/04 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2003/15] | G06F17/60, C09D7/14, C09D201/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2004/20] |
Former [2003/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FARBMISCHUNGEN | [2003/15] | English: | PAINT MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2003/15] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE PEINTURE | [2003/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2002 | Translation filed | 11.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2002 | Examination requested [2003/15] | 21.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.05.2007
16.05.2007
ADMISSIBLE BASF Coatings AG CT/R-B311 Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE Opponent's representative Fischer, Jens-Dieter W.E. BASF Coatings GmbH Patente/Lizenzen, Marken/Dokumentation Postfach 61 23 48136 Münster / DE | 02
08.05.2007
24.05.2007
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel Coatings International BV Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Hobel, Klaus Akzo Nobel N.V. Department AIP P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.05.2007
16.05.2007
ADMISSIBLE BASF Coatings AG CT/R-B311 Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE Opponent's representative Fischer, Jens-Dieter W.E. BASF Coatings AG, Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | ||
02
08.05.2007
24.05.2007
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel Coatings International BV Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Hobel, Klaus Akzo Nobel N.V. Department AIP P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | |||
Former [2007/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.05.2007
BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE Opponent's representative Fischer, Jens-Dieter W.E. BASF Coatings AG, Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | ||
02
08.05.2007
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel Coatings International BV Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Hobel, Klaus Akzo Nobel N.V. Department AIP P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | 13.06.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 22.08.2010 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 09.08.2006 | SE | 09.11.2006 | GB | 11.07.2007 | FR | 31.07.2008 | DE | 03.02.2009 | [2009/38] |
Former [2009/23] | FI | 09.08.2006 | |
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
GB | 11.07.2007 | ||
DE | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2008/26] | FI | 09.08.2006 | |
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
GB | 11.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 09.08.2006 | |
SE | 09.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10276294 ; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 51, Database accession no. 1998-605670, XP002305849 & JPH10276294 A 19981013 (CANON KK) [A] 1-19 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH1166119 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD); | [Y]JPH10324829 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2000170397 (SEKISUI HOUSE KK, et al); | [Y]JPH07160762 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]EP1006344 (KIKUSUI KAGAKU KOGYO KK [JP]) |