EP1304566 - BIOSENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANIIKE, Yuko 3-1-10, Kawarayamachi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0066 / JP | 02 /
IKEDA, Shin 2-5-16-205, Fujigao Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0022 / JP | 03 /
NANKAI, Shiro 4-50-12, Nasuzukuri Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0071 / JP | [2003/17] | Representative(s) | Price, Paul Anthony King, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | Price, Paul Anthony King, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01948050.8 | 17.07.2001 | [2003/17] | WO2001JP06188 | Priority number, date | JP20000222266 | 24.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000222266 | [2003/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0208743 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1304566 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1304566 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/447 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
G01N27/3272 (EP,US);
C12Q1/005 (EP,US);
C12Q1/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | BIOSENSOR | [2003/17] | English: | BIOSENSOR | [2003/17] | French: | BIOCAPTEUR | [2003/17] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2002 | Translation filed | 14.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2002 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 14.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 25.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5437999 (DIEBOLD ERIC R [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 2 - column 3 * * column 8 - column 12; figures 5,6; claims 1-3,10 *; | [A]EP0795601 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [X]WO9835225 (HELLER E & CO [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 1 - page 5 * * page 7 - page 22 *; | [X]EP0964059 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * column 1 - column 3 * * column 5 - column 8; figures 2-5; claims 1-6 *; | [A]EP0969097 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0984069 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]EP0685737 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [X]JPH09159642 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [X]JPH102874 (NOK CORP); | [Y]EP0964059 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0969282 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [X]JP2000065777 (NOK CORP); | [XP]JP2000258382 (ARKRAY INC) |