EP1352332 - LIVEEXCEPTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONCORD COMMUNICATIONS, INC. 600 Nickerson Road Marlboro, MA 01752 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Concord Communications, Inc. 600 Nickerson Road Marlboro, MA 01752 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SYLOR, Mark, W. 168 Harris Road Nashua, NH 03062 / US | 02 /
IGLESIAS, George 127 Hibbert Street Arlington, MA 02476 / US | 03 /
WOLF, Jay, B. 20843 Iran Ave. Lakeville, MN 55044 / US | 04 /
LAUER, Will, C. 118 Broadmeadow Road, Apt. E Marlboro, MA 01752 / US | 05 /
STABILE, Lawrence, A. 120 Commonwealth Road Cochituate, MA 01778 / US | [2004/01] |
Former [2003/42] | 01 /
SYLOR, Mark, W. 168 Harris Road Nashua, NH 03062 / US | ||
02 /
IGLESIAS, George 127 Hibbert Street Arlington, MA 02476 / US | |||
03 /
WOLF, Jay, B. 63 Lovering Avenue Framingham, MA 01701 / US | |||
04 /
LAUER, Will, C. 118 Broadmeadow Road, Apt. E Marlboro, MA 01752 / US | |||
05 /
STABILE, Lawrence, A. 120 Commonwealth Road Cochituate, MA 01778 / US | Representative(s) | Stainthorpe, Vanessa Juliet, et al HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Stainthorpe, Vanessa Juliet, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2003/42] | Stainthorpe, Vanessa Juliet, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Leopold Street Sheffield S1 2QD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01948545.7 | 21.06.2001 | [2003/42] | WO2001US19780 | Priority number, date | US20000213211P | 21.06.2000 Original published format: US 213211 P | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0198916 | Date: | 27.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1352332 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.12.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
H04L41/06 (EP,US);
H04L41/22 (EP,US);
H04L43/00 (EP,US);
H04L43/10 (EP,US);
H04L43/16 (EP,US);
H04L41/142 (EP,US);
H04L43/045 (EP,US);
H04L43/06 (EP,US);
H04L43/0817 (EP,US);
H04L43/0829 (EP,US);
H04L43/0852 (EP,US);
H04L43/087 (EP,US);
H04L43/0882 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/42] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/42] | Title | German: | LIVEEXCEPTION-SYSTEM | [2003/42] | English: | LIVEEXCEPTION SYSTEM | [2003/42] | French: | SYSTEME D'EXCEPTION DIRECTE | [2003/42] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2003 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 16.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 28.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.01.2007 | 30.01.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/39] | 20.07.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.04.2003 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 | 16.04.2003 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 | 16.04.2003 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 | 16.04.2003 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 | 16.04.2003 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 | 16.04.2003 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 | 16.04.2003 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 | 16.04.2003 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 | 16.04.2003 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 | 16.04.2003 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 | 16.04.2003 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 | 16.04.2003 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 | 16.04.2003 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 | 16.04.2003 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 | 16.04.2003 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 | 16.04.2003 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 | 16.04.2003 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 | 16.04.2003 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 | 16.04.2003 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.04.2003 | M01   Fee paid on   16.04.2003 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5724362 (LAU JOSEPH C [US]) [X] 1,13,15-18 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - line 11 * * column 1, line 42 - line 48 * * column 1, line 66 - column 3, line 31 * * column 3, line 66 - column 5, line 45 * * column 7, line 37 - line 59 * * claims 1,22 * * figures 3,4 * [A] 2-12,14; | [XA]WO0010455 (UNIV EMORY [US], et al) [X] 1,5,9,11-13,15-18 * abstract * * page 1, line 10 - line 14 * * page 3, line 4 - line 5 * * page 7, line 21 - line 29 * * page 15, line 18 - line 23 * * page 17, line 11 - line 26 * * page 20, line 1 - line 17 * * claims 1-5 * * figures 2,3,5,7-16 * [A] 2-4,6-8,10,14; | [PXA]US6098195 (NORTHCOTT PHILIP LYON [CA]) [PX] 1,13,15-18 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 43 * * claims 1,4,5,8,12,15 * * figure 1 *[PA] 2-12,14 | International search | [X]US6021437 (CHEN TY-FOUNE [FR], et al); | [XP]US6081840 (ZHAO YAN [US]) |