EP1294535 - OSCILLATING FIXED ABRASIVE CMP SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR IMPLEMENTING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAM RESEARCH CORPORATION 4650 Cushing Parkway Fremont, CA 94568-6516 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states LAM Research Corporation 4650 Cushing Parkway Fremont, CA 94568-6516 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALDANA, Miguel, A. 4468 Mattos Drive Fremont, CA 94536 / US | 02 /
OWCZARZ, Aleksander, A. 7523 Deveron Court San Jose, CA 95135 / US | [2003/29] |
Former [2003/13] | 01 /
SALDANA, Miguel, A. 38850 Farwell Drive 16-B Fremont, CA 94536 / US | ||
02 /
OWCZARZ, Aleksander, A. 7523 Deveron Court San Jose, CA 95135 / US | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co., 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead, Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 01948569.7 | 22.06.2001 | [2003/13] | WO2001US19837 | Priority number, date | US20000608513 | 30.06.2000 Original published format: US 608513 | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0202272 | Date: | 10.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1294535 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B24B37/04, B24B21/04, B24B21/00 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
B24B37/04 (EP,US);
H01L21/304 (KR);
B24B21/004 (EP,US);
B24B21/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHEMISCH-MECHANISCHE POLIERVORRICHTUNG MIT SCHWINGENDEM POLIERWERKZEUG, MIT FIXIERTEM SCHLEIFSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN ANWENDUNG | [2003/13] | English: | OSCILLATING FIXED ABRASIVE CMP SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR IMPLEMENTING THE SAME | [2003/13] | French: | SYSTEME FIXE DE POLISSAGE CHIMIQUE ET MECANIQUE ABRASIF OSCILLANT ET PROCEDES DE MIS EN OEUVRE DE CELUI-CI | [2003/13] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.12.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 03.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/25] | 07.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]WO9845090 (OBSIDIAN INC [US], et al) [X] 1,13,14,17,19 * page 2, line 13 - line 14 * * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 8 * * page 12, line 16 - line 22 * * page 14, line 1 - page 16, line 18 * * figure 4A * [A] 2,3,6-9,15,18,23 [Y] 23; | [XAY]WO0032356 (NUTOOL INC [US]) [X] 21,22 * page 3, line 19 - page 6, line 5 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 2 [Y] 23; | [X]US5335453 (BALDY ANDRE [FR], et al) [X] 1,14,17,19 * column 1, line 10 - line 17 * * column 6, line 13 - column 7, line 2 * * figures 8A,8B *; | [XA]US6039633 (CHOPRA DINESH [US]) [X] 1,17,19 * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 24 * * figure 2 * [A] 20 |