EP1325114 - A HUMAN BETA-KETOACYL SYNTHASE (46619) AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLENNIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 75 Sydney Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/28] | For all designated states Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 75 Sydney Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYERS, Rachel, E. 115 Devonshire Road Newton, MA 02468 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMSON, Mark 15 Stonecrest Drive Saugus, MA 01906 / US | [2003/28] | Representative(s) | Hall, Robert Leonard, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/28] | Hall, Robert Leonard, et al Harrison Goddard Foote, Fountain Precinct, Leopold Street Sheffield S1 2QD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01948746.1 | 26.06.2001 | [2003/28] | WO2001US20371 | Priority number, date | US20000214174P | 26.06.2000 Original published format: US 214174 P | [2003/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0200861 | Date: | 03.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1325114 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/88, C12N15/60, C07K16/40, G01N33/53, C12Q1/68 | [2003/28] | CPC: |
C12N9/1025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINE MENSCHLICHE BETA-KETOACYL SYNTHASE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2003/28] | English: | A HUMAN BETA-KETOACYL SYNTHASE (46619) AND USES THEREOF | [2003/28] | French: | 46619, UNE NOUVELLE SYNTHASE BETA-CETOACYLE ET UTILISATIONS DE CETTE DERNIERE | [2003/28] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 22.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/22] | 09.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6046029 (LAL PREETI [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [E]WO0155301 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [E] 1-18* see seq.ID.226 *; | [E]WO0157190 (HYSEQ INC [US], et al) [E] 1-22 * see seq.ID.955 *; | [X] - SUGANO S. ET AL., "Homo sapiens cDNA FLJ20604 fis, clone KAT06449.", EMBL, (20000222), XP002195435 [X] 1-22 * the whole document * | [PX] - STRAUSBERG, R., "Homo sapiens, hypothetical protein FLJ20604, clone MGC:4956 IMAGE:3446492, mRNA, complete cds.", EMBL, (20010531) [PX] * the whole document * | [X] - JIA, L. ET AL, "ag47f10.s1 Jia bone marrow stroma Homo sapiens cDNA clone IMAGE:1119979 3' similar to TR:P73283 P73283 BETA KETOACYL-ACYL CARRIER PROTEIN SYNTHASE. ;,mRNA sequence.", EMBL, (19980105), XP002195436 [X] 1-22 * the whole document * | [X] - "zk87d09.r1 Soares_pregnant_uterus_NbHPU Homo sapiens cDNA clone IMAGE:489809 5' similar to SW:FABF_ECOLI P39435 3-OXOACYL-[ACYL-CARRIER-PROTEIN] SYNTHASE II ;, mRNA sequence.", EMBL, (19961029), XP002195437 [X] 1-22 * the whole document * | [A] - JAYAKUMAR ARUMUGAM ET AL, "Human fatty acid synthase: Properties and molecular cloning.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, 1995, (1995), vol. 92, no. 19, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 8695 - 8699, XP002195434 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.19.8695 | [A] - KUHAJDA F P ET AL, "FATTY ACID SYNTHESIS: A POTENTIAL SELECTIVE TARGET FOR ANTINEOPLASTIC THERAPY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (199407), vol. 91, no. 14, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 6379 - 6383, XP000983310 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.14.6379 |