EP1299562 - GENE EXPRESSION IN BIOLOGICAL CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AROS APPLIED BIOTECHNOLOGY APS Østjysk Innovation, Gustav Wieds Vej 10 8000 Arhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states AROS APPLIED BIOTECHNOLOGY APS c/o stjysk Innovation, Gustav Wieds Vej 10 8000 Rhus C / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORNTOFT, Torben, F. Helgesvej 19 DK-8230 Aabyhoj / DK | 02 /
THYKJAER, Thomas Tranebaervej 26 DK-8220 Brabrand / DK | 03 /
DEMTRÖDER, Karin Solbakken 13 DK-8410 Ronde / DK | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | HOEIBERG A/S European Patent & Trademark Attorneys Store Kongensgade 59A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2003/15] | Hoeiberg, Susanne, et al Hoeiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59 A DK-1264 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 01949274.3 | 02.07.2001 | [2003/15] | WO2001DK00463 | Priority number, date | DK20000001020 | 30.06.2000 Original published format: DK 200001020 | [2003/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0202804 | Date: | 10.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1299562 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, A61K48/00, A61K39/395, A61K38/00 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/15] | Extension states | AL | 30.01.2003 | LT | 30.01.2003 | LV | 30.01.2003 | MK | 30.01.2003 | RO | 30.01.2003 | SI | 30.01.2003 | Title | German: | GENE EXPRESSION IN BIOLOGISCHEN GEWEBEN | [2003/15] | English: | GENE EXPRESSION IN BIOLOGICAL CONDITIONS | [2003/15] | French: | EXPRESSION GENIQUE DANS DES ETATS BIOLOGIQUES | [2003/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.01.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/15] | 12.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/06] | 24.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO0052204 (ORNTOFT TORBEN F [DK]) [PX] 1-10,19-42,46,50-61,70-86,88,89,91-93,95-113 * abstract *; | [X]WO9951772 (INCYTE PHARMA INC [US]) [X] 1-10,19-42,46,50-61,70-86,88,89,91-93,95-113 * page 10, line 15 - line 20 *; | [X]WO9710365 (AFFYMAX TECH NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-10,19-42,46,50-61,70-86,88,89,91-93,95-113 * page 1, line 16 - page 2, line 2 *; | [X]WO9853319 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [X] 1-10,19-42,46,50-61,70-86,88,89,91-93,95-113 * abstract *; | [X]WO9521944 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-10,19-42,46,50-61,70-86,88,89,91-93,95-113 * abstract *; | [X]WO9630389 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US]) [X] 1-10,19-42,46,50-61,70-86,88,89,91-93,95-113 * abstract *; | [X] - MARC O GRIMM ET AL, "Expression and progression pattern of transitional cell carcinoma of the bladder", THE JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, (200005), vol. 163, no. 4, page 127, XP002902076 [X] 1-10,19-42,46,50-61,70-86,88,89,91-93,95-113 * abstract * | [A] - TORBEN F ORNTOFT ET AL, "Molecular alterations in bladder cancer", UROL RES, (1998), vol. 26, pages 223 - 233, XP002902077 [A] 1-10,19-42,46,50-61,70-86,88,89,91-93,95-113 * page 229, column 2, line 24 - page 230, column 1, line 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002400050050 |