EP1299509 - FRICTION MODIFIER ADDITIVE COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Annandale NJ 08801-0900 / US | ||
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East, Clinton Township Annandale, New Jersey 08801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEIGERWALD, Edgar, Andreas Vorbeckweg 24 Hamburg / DE | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Troch, Geneviève, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Troch, Geneviève, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc., P.O. Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 01949345.1 | 17.05.2001 | [2003/15] | WO2001EP05656 | Priority number, date | GB20000011931 | 17.05.2000 Original published format: GB 0011931 | [2003/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0188067 | Date: | 22.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1299509 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1299509 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C10M141/06 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
C10M161/00 (EP);
C10M133/02 (EP);
C10M133/06 (EP);
C10M133/10 (EP);
C10M145/14 (EP);
C10M2209/084 (EP);
C10M2215/00 (EP);
C10M2215/04 (EP);
C10M2215/042 (EP);
C10M2215/044 (EP);
C10M2215/08 (EP);
C10M2215/082 (EP);
C10M2215/26 (EP);
C10M2215/28 (EP);
C10N2040/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIBUNGSMODIFIZIERENDE ZUSATZKOMBINATION | [2003/15] | English: | FRICTION MODIFIER ADDITIVE COMBINATION | [2003/15] | French: | MELANGE D'ADDITIFS A FONCTION DE MODIFICATEUR DE FROTTEMENT | [2003/15] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/15] | 01.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9306198 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * page 3, line 12 - page 3, line 24 * * page 7, line 13 - page 15, line 12 ** page 29, lubricant L *; | [X]EP0747464 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * page 2, line 56 - page 3, line 17 * * page 13, line 37 - page 13, line 42 *; | [XA]EP0748862 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]) [X] 1,10-18 * page 24, line 31 * * page 21, line 53 - page 21, line 55 * [A] 2-9; | [X]WO9704049 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-18 * claims 1,4-6,8 * * page 6, line 14 - page 8, line 33 *; | [X]WO9709401 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-18 * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 2 * * page 11, line 21 - page 12, line 39 * * page 14, line 4 - page 14, line 16 * * claims 1,4,6 *; | [X]US5646099 (WATTS RAYMOND FREDERICK [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * claims 1,5,6 * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 25 * * column 4, line 31 - column 7, line 62 *; | [X]EP0812900 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * page 2, line 31 - page 2, line 53 * * page 5, line 35 * * page 8, example 4 * * page 10, comparative example 8 *; | [X]US5773393 (ADAMS PAUL ERNEST [US]) [X] 1-18 * column A * * column 2, line 26 - column 2, line 41 * * column 18, line 4 - column 5, line 8 * * claims 1-6,31-38 *; | [X]WO9839400 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - page 3, line 13 * * page 15, line 7 - page 17, line 24 * * page 23, line 15 - page 25, line 35 * * claims 1,4,10,18 *; | [X]WO9902628 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * claims 1-5,7-10,12 * * page 1, line 5 - page 1, line 11 * * page 7, line 1 - page 12, line 15 * |