EP1302600 - ELECTRONIC CONTROL SYSTEM FOR CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/16] | ELECTRONIC CONTROL SYSTEM OF CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY | ||
[2014/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 5-1, Koraku 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8563 / JP | [2014/27] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 5-1, Koraku 2-chome Bunkyo-ku, Tokyo 112-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Hiroshi 1082-66, Tagucho Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-1236 / JP | 02 /
ISHIMOTO, Hidefumi Shiho-ryo 20-29, Kandatsuchuo 2-chome Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0011 / JP | 03 /
OGURA, Hiroshi Gurandohru-U-II-205 7-14, Hiradai 3-chome Ryugasaki-shi, Ibaraki 301-0003 / JP | 04 /
ADACHI, Hiroyuki 848, Okijukumachi Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0023 / JP | [2014/37] |
Former [2003/16] | 01 /
WATANABE, Hiroshi 1082-66, Tagucho Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-1236 / JP | ||
02 /
ISHIMOTO, Hidefumi Shiho-ryo, 20-29, Kandatsuchuo 2-chome Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0011 / JP | |||
03 /
OGURA, Hiroshi Gurandohru-U-II-205, 7-14, Hiradai 3-chome Ryugasaki-shi, Ibaraki 301-0003 / JP | |||
04 /
ADACHI, Hiroyuki 848, Okijukumachi Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0023 / JP | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstraße 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/16] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01949971.4 | 13.07.2001 | [2003/16] | WO2001JP06085 | Priority number, date | JP20000215330 | 17.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000215330 | [2003/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0206592 | Date: | 24.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1302600 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1302600 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/20, H04L12/40, G05B23/02, G05B15/02 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
E02F9/26 (EP,US);
G05B15/02 (KR);
E02F9/2228 (EP,US);
E02F9/2235 (EP,US);
E02F9/2246 (EP,US);
E02F9/2296 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/16] | E02F9/20, H04L12/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/21] |
Former [2003/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES KONTROLLSYSTEM FÜR EINE BAUMASCHINE | [2003/16] | English: | ELECTRONIC CONTROL SYSTEM FOR CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY | [2014/30] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE ELECTRONIQUE D'UNE MACHINE DE CONSTRUCTION | [2003/16] |
Former [2003/16] | ELECTRONIC CONTROL SYSTEM OF CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2002 | Translation filed | 05.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 10.09.2014 | SE | 10.09.2014 | [2015/37] |
Former [2015/09] | SE | 10.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9942327 (CASE CORP [US]) [A] 1* page 9, line 1 - page 11, line 5 *; | [X]WO0020989 (CASE CORP [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 6, line 21 - page 7, line 7 * * page 9, line 25 - page 19, line 25 * | International search | [Y]JP8028911B ; | [Y]JP2922004B | by applicant | JPH07110287 | JP8028911B | WO0020989 |