EP1307977 - SATELLITE COMMUNICATION CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spacenet, Inc. 1750 Old Meadow Road McLean, VA 22102 / US | For all designated states Gilat Satellite Networks Ltd. Yegla Kapayim Street 21 49130 Keryat Arye Petah Tikva / IL | [2003/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEN-BASSAT, Itzik, Gilat Satellite Networks, Ltd 21 Yegla Kapayim St., Kiryat Arye Petah Tikva 49130 / IL | 02 /
OPHIR, Ido, Gilat Satellite Networks, Ltd 12 Yegla Kapayim St., Kiryat Arye Petah Tikva 49130 / IL | 03 /
BONEH, Rafi, Gilat Satellite Networks, Ltd 21 Yegla Kapayim St., Kiryat Arye Petah Tikva 49130 / IL | 04 /
GAL, Yossi, Gilat Satellite Networks, Ltd 21 Yegla Kapayim St., Kiryat Arye Petah Tikva 49130 / IL | 05 /
GOLDFARB, Ariel, Gilat Satellite Networks, Ltd 12 Yegla Kapayim St., Kiryat Arye Petah Tikva 49130 / IL | 06 /
MARCUS, Tal, Gilat Satellite Networks, Ltd 21 Yegla Kapayim St., Kiryat Arye Petah Tikva 49130 / IL | 07 /
SHAFIR, Ofer, Gilat Satellite Networks, Ltd 21 Yegla Kapayim St., Kiryat Arye Petah Tikva 49130 / IL | 08 /
RAHAMIM, David, Gilat Satellite Networks, Ltd 21 Yegla Kapayim St., Kiryat Arye Petah Tikva 49130 / IL | 09 /
COMFORTI, Amir, Gilat Satellite Networks, Ltd 21 Yegla Kapayim St., Kiryat Arye Petah Tikva 49130 / IL | 10 /
HAYOUN, Yariv, Gilat Satellite Networks, Ltd 21 Yegla Kapayim St., Kiryat Arye Petah Tikva 49130 / IL | 11 /
SHEICH, Oren, Gilat Satellite Networks, Ltd 21 Yegla Kapayim St., Kiryat Arye Petah Tikva 49130 / IL | 12 /
RIDEL, Eran, Gilat Satellite Networks, Ltd 21 Yegla Kapayim St., Kiryat Arye Petah Tikva 49130 / IL | 13 /
OSSDON, Ilan, Gilat Satellite Networks, Ltd 21 Yegla Kapayim St., Kiryat Arye Petah Tikva 49130 / IL | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Wallin, Nicholas James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | Wallin, Nicholas James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2003/19] | Sayer, Robert David, et al Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01950305.1 | 15.06.2001 | [2003/19] | WO2001US19199 | Priority number, date | US20000211528P | 15.06.2000 Original published format: US 211528 P | US20010880103 | 14.06.2001 Original published format: US 880103 | [2003/32] |
Former [2003/19] | US20000211528P | 15.06.2000 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0197403 | Date: | 20.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1307977 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1307977 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185, H04B1/38 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
H04B1/3816 (EP,US);
H01Q1/46 (US);
H04B1/38 (EP,US);
H04B7/18597 (EP,US);
H04L1/004 (US);
H04B1/00 (EP,US);
H04B2001/0491 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SATELLITEN KOMMUNIKATIONSKART | [2003/19] | English: | SATELLITE COMMUNICATION CARD | [2003/19] | French: | CARTE DE COMMUNICATIONS SATELLITE | [2003/19] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.01.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 19.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.02.2003 | M01   Fee paid on   14.02.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.03.2009 | BE | 25.03.2009 | CY | 25.03.2009 | DK | 25.03.2009 | FI | 25.03.2009 | IT | 25.03.2009 | NL | 25.03.2009 | TR | 25.03.2009 | IE | 15.06.2009 | LU | 15.06.2009 | SE | 25.06.2009 | GR | 26.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | ES | 06.07.2009 | PT | 31.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IT | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 15.06.2009 | ||
LU | 15.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IT | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 15.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 15.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 15.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | FI | 25.03.2009 | |
SE | 25.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0734140 (SPACE ENGINEERING SPA) [DA] 1-41 * column 4, line 5 - column 5, line 1; figures 1-4; claims 1-15 *; | [A]WO9913616 (WORLDSPACE INC) [A] 1-41 * page 2, line 23 - page 4, line 4 * * page 17, line 18 - page 21, line 5; figure 5 *; | [A]US5742639 (ANDERSON SAMUEL S ET AL) [A] 1-41 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 48 * * column 4, line 18 - column 6, line 28; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0276932 (NORSAT INTERNATIONAL INC) [A] 1-41 * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 43; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9726762 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO) [A] 1-41 * page 1, line 30 - page 3, line 10; figure 1 * |