EP1296728 - SYSTEMS, METHODS AND DEVICES FOR REMOVING OBSTRUCTIONS FROM A BLOOD VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Concentric Medical, Inc. 2585 Leghorn Street Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2003/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEPETKA, Ivan 346 Costello Court Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 02 /
DIECK, Martin 21105 Hazelbrook Drive Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
GIA, Son 5065 Bengal Drive San Jose, CA 95111 / US | 04 /
MILLER, John 603 Vera Avenue Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 05 /
NGO, Tiffany, Tran 2108-D Galveston Avenue San Jose, CA 95122 / US | 06 /
PIERCE, Ryan 728 Calderon Avenue Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Oxley, Rachel Louise, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Cochlin, Rachel Louise, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01950567.6 | 28.06.2001 | [2003/14] | WO2001US20509 | Priority number, date | US20000605143 | 29.06.2000 Original published format: US 605143 | US20010756476 | 08.01.2001 Original published format: US 756476 | US20010891141 | 25.06.2001 Original published format: US 891141 | [2003/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0202162 | Date: | 10.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1296728 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.01.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
A61B17/221 (EP,US);
A61B17/22031 (EP,US);
A61F2/013 (EP,US);
A61M25/0082 (EP,US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22034 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2212 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2215 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2217 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00214 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00898 (EP,US);
A61F2002/016 (EP,US);
A61F2002/018 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0091 (EP,US);
A61M25/0068 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUT ENTFERNUNG VON BLOKADEN AUS EINEM BLUTGEFÄSS | [2003/14] | English: | SYSTEMS, METHODS AND DEVICES FOR REMOVING OBSTRUCTIONS FROM A BLOOD VESSEL | [2003/14] | French: | SYSTEMES, PROCEDES ET DISPOSITIFS SERVANT A ELIMINER DES MATIERES OBSTRUANT UN VAISSEAU SANGUIN | [2003/14] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 17.03.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/49] | 26.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4706671 (WEINRIB HARRY P [US]) [X] 1-8 * figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]WO9533513 (COOK PACEMAKER CORP [US]) [A] 4* page 6, lines 19-25 *; | [X]EP0820729 (TARGET THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * figures 2,4A,7C,8A *; | [X]US5814064 (DANIEL JOHN M K [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * figures 1,3,16A,16B *; | [A]US5827324 (CASSELL ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 4,5 *; | [DA]US5895398 (WENSEL JEFFREY P [US], et al) [DA] 1-8 * figures 1B,1C,8,15 *; | [X]WO9956801 (MICROVENTION INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * figures 5B,5C * | International search | [X]US5827324 (CASSELL ROBERT L [US], et al); | [X]US5814064 (DANIEL JOHN M K [US], et al) |