EP1301287 - VIBRATORY SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M-I L.L.C. 5950 North Course Drive Houston, TX 77072 / US | [2003/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARR, Brian, S. 10786 Autumn Ridge Dr. Independence, KY 41051 / US | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Viering, Hans-Martin Viering, Jentschura & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Hans-Martin Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/16] | Viering, Hans-Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Viering, Jentschura & Partner, Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01950910.8 | 05.07.2001 | [2003/16] | WO2001US21332 | Priority number, date | US20000610633 | 05.07.2000 Original published format: US 610633 | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0205974 | Date: | 24.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1301287 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1301287 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B07B1/46, B01D39/12 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
B07B1/4663 (EP,US);
B07B1/4618 (EP,US);
B07B1/4672 (EP,US);
B07B2201/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, GB [2004/40] |
Former [2003/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWINGSIEB | [2003/16] | English: | VIBRATORY SCREEN | [2003/16] | French: | TAMIS A VIBRATIONS | [2003/16] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 11.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2082513 (EUGENE ROBERTS) [X] 1,5-8 * the whole document * [Y] 4,11,12; | [A]US3905788 (ALLIGER HOWARD) [A] 1-3,9 * abstract ** column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 6 *; | [YA]WO9924144 (ITS DRILLING SERVICES LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 4,11,12 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 11 * [A] 2,3,9 |