EP1366183 - METHODS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF PSYCHIATRIC DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 5th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELSOE, John, R., Jr. 14275 Recuerdo Drive Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | 02 /
BARRETT, Thomas, B. Apartment 15 8231 Camino Camino del Oro La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 03 /
NICULESCU, Alexander, B., III 8044 Caminito Mallorca La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2003/49] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01950942.1 | 06.07.2001 | [2003/49] | WO2001US21453 | Priority number, date | US20000216263P | 06.07.2000 Original published format: US 216263 P | [2003/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0204677 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1366183 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2003/49] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/49] | Extension states | AL | 09.01.2003 | LT | 09.01.2003 | LV | 09.01.2003 | MK | 09.01.2003 | RO | 09.01.2003 | SI | 09.01.2003 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON PSYCHIATRISCHEN KRANKHEITEN | [2003/49] | English: | METHODS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF PSYCHIATRIC DISORDERS | [2003/49] | French: | PROCEDE DESTINE AU DIAGNOSTIC ET AU TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES MENTAUX | [2003/49] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 24.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/12] | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y] - DECKERT J ET AL, "Adenosine A1 receptor and bipolar affective disorder: systematic screening of the gene and association studies.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF MEDICAL GENETICS. UNITED STATES 7 FEB 1998, (19980207), vol. 81, no. 1, ISSN 0148-7299, pages 18 - 23, XP009005426 [Y] 1-11 * page 19, column 1, line 15 - line 26 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1096-8628(19980207)81:1<18::AID-AJMG4>3.0.CO;2-J | [Y] - SOBELL J L ET AL, "Novel association approach for determining the genetic predisposition to schizophrenia: case-control resource and testing of a candidate gene.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF MEDICAL GENETICS. UNITED STATES 1 MAY 1993, (19930501), vol. 48, no. 1, ISSN 0148-7299, pages 28 - 35, XP009005427 [Y] 1-11 * page 28, column 2, line 1 - line 12 * * abstract * * page 33, column 1, line 14 - line 40 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ajmg.1320480108 | [Y] - CARLSSON B ET AL, "Total RNA and array-based expression monitoring.", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY. UNITED STATES JUN 2000, (200006), vol. 18, no. 6, ISSN 1087-0156, page 579, XP002230605 [Y] 1-11 * For details see references therein; page 579, column 1, line 1 - line 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/76321 | [T] - WILLIAMS NIGEL M ET AL, "Genome scans and microarrays: converging on genes for schizophrenia?", GENOME BIOLOGY ENGLAND 2002, (2002), vol. 3, no. 4, ISSN 1465-6914, page REVIEWS1011, XP002230606 [T] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - MCKENZIE S E ET AL, "PARALLEL MOLECULAR GENETIC ANALYSIS", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, KARGER, BASEL, CH, (199809), vol. 6, no. 5, ISSN 1018-4813, pages 417 - 429, XP000953253 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * INTRODUCTION * * DNA MICROARRAYS * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.ejhg.5200218 |