EP1307714 - OPTICAL HETERODYNE DETECTION IN OPTICAL CAVITY RINGDOWN SPECTROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Macquarie Research Ltd. Becton Dickinson Building, 2nd floor, Research Park Drive, Macquarie University Sydney, NSW 2109 / AU | [2003/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORR, Brian, John 45 Pleasant Avenue East Lindfield, NSW 2070 / AU | 02 /
HE, Yabai 50/125 Park Road Dundas, NSW 2117 / AU | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01951206.0 | 12.07.2001 | [2003/19] | WO2001AU00834 | Priority number, date | AU2000PQ08724 | 12.07.2000 Original published format: AU PQ872400 | AU2000PQ09785 | 30.08.2000 Original published format: AU PQ978500 | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0204903 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1307714 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 17.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/433, G01N21/39, H01S3/105 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
G01N21/39 (EP,US);
G01J3/42 (EP,US);
G01N2021/391 (EP,US);
H01S3/1062 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE HETERODYNDETEKTION BEI DER OTPISCHEN CAVITY-RINGDOWN-SPEKTROSKOPIE | [2003/19] | English: | OPTICAL HETERODYNE DETECTION IN OPTICAL CAVITY RINGDOWN SPECTROSCOPY | [2003/19] | French: | DETECTION OPTIQUE HETERODYNE EN SPECTROSCOPIE OPTIQUE DE RINGDOWN DE CAVITE | [2003/19] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 27.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 25.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/18] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP1046900 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [PX] 1,17* paragraphs [0030] - [0051]; figures 1,2 *; | [XY] - LEVENSON M D ET AL, "OPTICAL HETERODYNE DETECTION IN CAVITY RING-DOWN SPECTROSCOPY", CHEMICAL PHYSICS LETTERS, NORTH-HOLLAND, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19980703), vol. 290, ISSN 0009-2614, pages 335 - 340, XP000989733 [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9,11,12,17 * pages 336-338; figure 1 * [Y] 1-22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-2614(98)00500-4 | [A] - PALDUS B A ET AL, "Cavity-locked ring-down spectroscopy", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19980415), vol. 83, no. 8, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 3991 - 3997, XP012044985 [A] 1 * page 3993; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.367155 | [Y] - YABAI HE ET AL, "Ringdown and cavity-enhanced absorption spectroscopy using a continuous-wave tunable diode laser and a rapidly swept optical cavity", Chemical Physics Letters Elsevier Netherlands, (20000310), vol. 319, no. 1-2, ISSN 0009-2614, pages 131 - 137, XP002420932 [Y] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-2614(00)00107-X | [A] - CROSSON E R ET AL, "Pulse-stacked cavity ring-down spectroscopy", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, (199901), vol. 70, no. 1, ISSN 0034-6748, pages 4 - 10, XP012036962 [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph II; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1149533 | [A] - DEVOE R G ET AL, "Laser-frequency division and stabilization", Physical Review A (General Physics) USA, (198411), vol. 30, no. 5, ISSN 0556-2791, pages 2827 - 2829, XP002420933 [A] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevA.30.2827 | International search | [A]GB2197118 (US ENERGY); | [A]US5903358 (ZARE RICHARD N [US], et al); | [A]US6084682 (ZARE RICHARD N [US], et al); | [AP]US6094267 (LEVENSON MARC D [US], et al) |