EP1301708 - RADIAL PISTON PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/34] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANK, Kurt Schelmenwasen 14 73614 Schorndorf / DE | [2003/16] | Application number, filing date | 01951390.2 | 15.06.2001 | [2003/16] | WO2001DE02234 | Priority number, date | DE2000132577 | 05.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10032577 | [2003/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0202937 | Date: | 10.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1301708 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1301708 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F04B1/04, F04B53/02 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
F04B1/0408 (EP,US);
F04B1/0421 (EP,US);
F04B53/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2003/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | RADIALKOLBENPUMPE | [2003/16] | English: | RADIAL PISTON PUMP | [2003/16] | French: | POMPE A PISTONS RADIAUX | [2003/16] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 10.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3153987 (HANS THOMA) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2948346 (HEILMEIER & WEINLEIN [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6, paragraph L - page 7 * * paragraph [0002]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO9834027 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [Y]EP0967384 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * page 2, line 27 - line 40 * * page 3, line 26 - line 47; figures 1A,1B *; | [YD]DE19847044 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [YD] 1-3 * column 2, line 30 - line 67; figures 1-3 * |