EP1303734 - MICRO HEAT EXCHANGER WITH CROSSING, SEPARATE CHANNELS FOR THE HEAT EXCHANGE MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORGES, Stephan Boehrer-Strasse 32 71640 Ludwigsburg / DE | 02 /
LEUTHNER, Stephan Karlsbader Strasse 9 70372 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/17] | Application number, filing date | 01951408.2 | 20.06.2001 | [2003/17] | WO2001DE02279 | Priority number, date | DE2000133908 | 12.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10033908 | [2003/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0204880 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1303734 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1303734 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F28F7/02 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
F28D1/05383 (EP);
F28F7/02 (EP);
F28F9/182 (EP);
F28F2260/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/17] | Title | German: | MIKRO-WÄRMEÜBERTRAGER MIT SICH KREUZENDEN, VONEINANDER GETRENNTEN KANÄLEN FÜR DIE WÄRMETRÄGERMEDIEN | [2003/17] | English: | MICRO HEAT EXCHANGER WITH CROSSING, SEPARATE CHANNELS FOR THE HEAT EXCHANGE MEDIA | [2003/17] | French: | MICRO-CALOPORTEUR COMPORTANT DES CANAUX CROISES SEPARES LES UNS DES AUTRES, DESTINES AUX MILIEUX CALOPORTEURS | [2003/17] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 29.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.03.2004 | FI | 31.03.2004 | GB | 31.03.2004 | IE | 31.03.2004 | IT | 31.03.2004 | NL | 31.03.2004 | TR | 31.03.2004 | AT | 20.06.2004 | LU | 20.06.2004 | BE | 30.06.2004 | DK | 30.06.2004 | GR | 30.06.2004 | MC | 30.06.2004 | SE | 30.06.2004 | PT | 31.08.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | CY | 31.03.2004 | |
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
IT | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
TR | 31.03.2004 | ||
AT | 20.06.2004 | ||
LU | 20.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2007/10] | CY | 31.03.2004 | |
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
TR | 31.03.2004 | ||
AT | 20.06.2004 | ||
LU | 20.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
TR | 31.03.2004 | ||
AT | 20.06.2004 | ||
LU | 20.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
AT | 20.06.2004 | ||
LU | 20.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
AT | 20.06.2004 | ||
LU | 20.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
LU | 20.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
LU | 20.06.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GB | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
SE | 30.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS59194807 ; | [A]US4681157 (SCHWARZ HANS-DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,11,12 * column 5 - column 6, line 39; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE3926466 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5046555 (NGUYEN HUNG P [US]) [A] 2,4,6,11,12 * column 3, line 37 - column 6, line 23; figure - *; | [A]DE19536117 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 2 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 3; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9855813 (AMERICAN STANDARD INC [US]) [A] 2* abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850316), vol. 009, no. 060, Database accession no. (M - 364), & JP59194807 A 19841105 (NIPPON RADIATOR KK) [A] 2 * abstract * |