EP1299477 - POLYAMIDE COMPOSITIONS WITH IMPROVED ANTISTATIC AND HYDROPHILIC PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rhodia Performance Fibres Avenue de l'Ermitage 62053 Saint Laurent Blangy Cedex / FR | For all designated states Bianchi, Jean-Pierre 13, rue du Péage 07800 Charmes sur Rhone / FR | For all designated states Bordes, Bertrand 39, rue du Lieutenant Colonel Prévost 69006 Lyon / FR | For all designated states Chaubet, Olivier 10, rue Louis Barthou 26000 Valence / FR | For all designated states Rochat, Sandrine 132, rue Dedieu 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | For all designated states Roche, Eric Route de Mongey 38200 Luzinay / FR | [2007/47] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states Rhodia Performance Fibres Avenue de l'Ermitage 62053 Saint Laurent Blangy Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states Bianchi, Jean-Pierre 13, rue de Péage 07800 Charmes sur Rhone / FR | |||
For all designated states Bordes, Bertrand 27, boulevard République 38200 Vienne / FR | |||
For all designated states Chaubet, Olivier 10, rue Louis Barthou 26000 Valence / FR | |||
For all designated states Rochat, Sandrine 132, rue Dedieu 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | |||
For all designated states Roche, Eric Route de Mongey 38200 Luzinay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIANCHI, Jean-Pierre 13, rue du Péage F-07800 CHARMES sur RHONE / FR | 02 /
BORDES, Bertrand 39,rue du Lieutenant Colonel Prévost F-69006 Lyon / FR | 03 /
CHAUBET, Olivier 10, rue Louis Barthou F-26000 VALENCE / FR | 04 /
ROCHAT, Sandrine 132, rue Dedieu F-69100 VILLEURBANNE / FR | 05 /
ROCHE, Eric Route de Mongey F-38200 LUZINAY / FR | [2007/46] |
Former [2003/22] | 01 /
BIANCHI, Jean-Pierre 13, rue du Péage F-07800 CHARMES sur RHONE / FR | ||
02 /
BORDES, Bertrand 39,rue du Lieutenant Colonel Prèvost F-69006 Lyon / FR | |||
03 /
CHAUBET, Olivier 10, rue Louis Barthou F-26000 VALENCE / FR | |||
04 /
ROCHAT, Sandrine 132, rue Dedieu F-69100 VILLEURBANNE / FR | |||
05 /
ROCHE, Eric Route de Mongey F-38200 LUZINAY / FR | |||
Former [2003/15] | 01 /
BIANCHI, Jean-Pierre 13, rue du Péage F-07800 CHARMES sur RHONE / FR | ||
02 /
BORDES, Bertrand 27, boulevard République F-38200 VIENNE / FR | |||
03 /
CHAUBET, Olivier 10, rue Louis Barthou F-26000 VALENCE / FR | |||
04 /
ROCHAT, Sandrine 132, rue Dedieu F-69100 VILLEURBANNE / FR | |||
05 /
ROCHE, Eric Route de Mongey F-38200 LUZINAY / FR | Representative(s) | Esson, Jean-Pierre Rhodia Services Direction de la Propriété Industrielle CRIT-Carrières B.P. 62 69192 Saint-Fons Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Esson, Jean-Pierre Rhodia Services Direction de la Propriété Industrielle CRIT-Carrières B.P. 62 69192 Saint-Fons Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2003/15] | Esson, Jean-Pierre Rhodia Services, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, Centre de Recherche Lyonnais, BP 62 69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01951759.8 | 03.07.2001 | [2003/15] | WO2001FR02128 | Priority number, date | FR20000008632 | 03.07.2000 Original published format: FR 0008632 | [2003/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0202696 | Date: | 10.01.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1299477 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1299477 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08L77/00, C08L77/02, C08L77/06 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
C08L77/00 (EP,US);
C08L77/02 (EP,US);
C08L77/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L77/00, C08L77/00 (EP,US);
C08L77/00, C08L77/12 (US,EP);
C08L77/02, C08L77/12 (US,EP);
C08L77/06, C08L77/12 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYAMID-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERBESSERTEN ANTISTATISCHEN UND HYDROPHILEN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2003/15] | English: | POLYAMIDE COMPOSITIONS WITH IMPROVED ANTISTATIC AND HYDROPHILIC PROPERTIES | [2003/15] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POLYAMIDES A ANTISTATICITE ET HYDROPHILIE AMELIOREES | [2003/15] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/15] | 07.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.11.2007 | CY | 21.11.2007 | DK | 21.11.2007 | FI | 21.11.2007 | GB | 21.11.2007 | IE | 21.11.2007 | NL | 21.11.2007 | TR | 21.11.2007 | SE | 21.02.2008 | DE | 22.02.2008 | GR | 22.02.2008 | ES | 04.03.2008 | PT | 21.04.2008 | LU | 03.07.2008 | BE | 31.07.2008 | CH | 31.07.2008 | FR | 31.07.2008 | IT | 31.07.2008 | LI | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
CY | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
GB | 21.11.2007 | ||
IE | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
TR | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
DE | 22.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
LU | 03.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
FR | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
CY | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
GB | 21.11.2007 | ||
IE | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
DE | 22.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
LU | 03.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
FR | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
CY | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
GB | 21.11.2007 | ||
IE | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
DE | 22.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
FR | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
CY | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
GB | 21.11.2007 | ||
IE | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
DE | 22.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
GB | 21.11.2007 | ||
IE | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
DE | 22.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
GB | 21.11.2007 | ||
IE | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
DE | 22.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
GB | 21.11.2007 | ||
IE | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
DE | 22.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/03] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
GB | 21.11.2007 | ||
IE | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
DE | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
IE | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
DE | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | FI | 21.11.2007 | |
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | NL | 21.11.2007 | |
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5321099 (GOLDWASSER DAVID J [US], et al); | [A]DE19745701 (BUNA SOW LEUNA OLEFINVERB GMBH [DE]); | [A]FR2019408 (ICI LTD); | [A]EP0861875 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) |