EP1297455 - NETWORK-BASED PHOTOMASK DATA ENTRY INTERFACE AND INSTRUCTION GENERATOR FOR MANUFACTURING PHOTOMASKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DuPont Photomasks, Inc. 131 Old Settlers Boulevard Round Rock Texas 78664 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states DuPont Photomasks, Inc. 131 Old Settlers Boulevard Round Rock, Texas 78664 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COGDELL, Thomas, T. 2200 Canterbury Street Austin, TX 78702 / US | 02 /
SCHEPP, Jeffry, S. 1708 Crestline Court Round ROck, TX 78664 / US | 03 /
GENTRY, Jan, E. 310 Highland Estates Round Rock, TX 78664 / US | [2004/02] |
Former [2003/25] | 01 /
COGDELL, Thomas, T. 2200 Canterbury Street Austin, TX 78702 / US | ||
02 /
SCHEPP, Jeffry, S. 1708 Crestline Court Round ROck, TX 78664 / US | |||
03 /
GENTRY, Jan, E. 961 Gardenbrook Ct. Palm Bay, Fl 32909 / US | |||
Former [2003/14] | 01 /
COGDELL, Thomas, T. 2200 Canterbury Street Austin, TX 78702 / US | ||
02 /
SCHEPP, Jeffry, S. 1708 Crestline Court Round ROck, TX 78664 / US | |||
03 /
GENTRY, Jan, E. 310 Highland Estates Round Rock, TX 78664 / US | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [2003/14] | Lawrence, John Barker, Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01952380.2 | 29.06.2001 | [2003/14] | WO2001US21020 | Priority number, date | US20000610917 | 05.07.2000 Original published format: US 610917 | [2003/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0203141 | Date: | 10.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1297455 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
G03F1/00 (EP,US);
G03F1/68 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0603 (EP,US);
G06Q50/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/21] |
Former [2003/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NETZWERKBASIERTE EINGABESCHNITTSTELLE VON DATEN ZUR ERSTELLUNG VON PHOTOMASKEN UND GENERATOR VON INSTRUKTIONEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PHOTOMASKEN | [2003/14] | English: | NETWORK-BASED PHOTOMASK DATA ENTRY INTERFACE AND INSTRUCTION GENERATOR FOR MANUFACTURING PHOTOMASKS | [2003/14] | French: | INTERFACE D'ENTREES DE DONNEES DE MASQUES DE PHOTOGRAVURE BASEE SUR RESEAU ET GENERATEUR D'INSTRUCTIONS DESTINEES A LA FABRICATION DE MASQUES DE PHOTOGRAVURE | [2003/14] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 28.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 26.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.08.2003 | 30.06.2015 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5933350 (FUJIMOTO SHINICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-26 * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 24 * * column 2, line 63 - line 67 * * column 6, line 43 - column 7, line 32 *; | [X]EP1003087 (D APPLIC COMP IND [FR]) [X] 1-26 * column 1, line 53 - column 3, line 5; figure 1 * * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 16 * * column 5, line 20 - column 6, line 16 *; | [A]US5950201 (VAN HUBEN GARY ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 57 * * column 6, line 54 - line 67 * * column 9, line 40 - column 13, line 22 * * column 27, line 33 - line 51 * * column 28, line 10 - line 39 *; | [X] - PELTIER J ET AL, "Low cost, prototype ASIC and MCM fabrication and assembly from the MOSIS service", PROCEEDINGS. 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MICROELECTRONIC SYSTEMS EDUCATION, MSE'97. DOING MORE WITH LESS IN A RAPIDLY CHANGING ENVIRONMENT' (CAT. NO.97TB100127), PROCEEDINGS OF INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MICROELECTRONIC SYSTEMS EDUCATION,, 1997, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc. Press, USA, ISBN 0-8186-7996-4, pages 68 - 69, XP002199595 [X] 1-26 * page 1 - page 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MSE.1997.612551 | [A] - LUO R C ET AL, "Desktop rapid prototyping system with supervisory control and monitoring through Internet", IEEE/ASME TRANSACTIONS ON MECHATRONICS, DEC. 2001, IEEE, USA, vol. 6, no. 4, ISSN 1083-4435, pages 399 - 409, XP002199596 [A] 1-26 * page 399, column L, paragraph 3 - page 401, column R, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 * * page 403, column L, paragraph 4 - page 404, column L, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/3516.974853 | Examination | - JENNIFER PELTIER, WES HANSFORD, "MIDAS: The Multichip Module Designers' Access Service", Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering 1995, (19951024), pages 543 - 547, XP001080320 |