EP1301228 - DEPLOYMENT SYSTEM FOR MYOCARDIAL CELLULAR MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Cardiovascular Systems Inc. 3200 Lakeside Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054-2207 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Abbott Cardiovascular Systems Inc. 3200 Lakeside Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054-2207 / US | ||
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Abbott Cardiovascular Systems Inc. 3200 Lakeside Drive Santa Clara CA 95054-2207 / US | ||
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states Bioheart, Inc. Suite 408, 2400 North Commerce Parkway Weston, FL 33326 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEONHARDT, Howard, J. 3425 Stallion Lane Weston, FL 33331 / US | 02 /
LASHINSKI, Robert, D. 9519 Mill Station Road Sebastopol, CA 95472 / US | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01952692.0 | 13.07.2001 | [2003/16] | WO2001US22029 | Priority number, date | US20000217976P | 13.07.2000 Original published format: US 217976 P | US20000217977P | 13.07.2000 Original published format: US 217977 P | US20000253514P | 28.11.2000 Original published format: US 253514 P | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0205866 | Date: | 24.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1301228 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1301228 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.05.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/178 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
A61M37/0069 (EP,US);
A61M25/0068 (EP,US);
A61M25/0084 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00243 (EP,US);
A61K35/12 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0086 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0087 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINBRINGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR MYOKARDIALES, ZELLULARES MATERIAL | [2008/26] | English: | DEPLOYMENT SYSTEM FOR MYOCARDIAL CELLULAR MATERIAL | [2003/16] | French: | SYSTEME DE DEPLOIEMENT DESTINE A UN MATERIAU CELLULAIRE DU MYOCARDE | [2003/16] |
Former [2003/16] | ENTFALTUNGSSYSTEM FÜR MYOKARDIALES, ZELLULARES MATERIAL | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 28.03.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 27.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 27.03.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 27.03.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2004 | 31.07.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   03.08.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.07.2008 | BE | 23.07.2008 | CY | 23.07.2008 | DK | 23.07.2008 | FI | 23.07.2008 | IT | 23.07.2008 | NL | 23.07.2008 | TR | 23.07.2008 | SE | 23.10.2008 | GR | 24.10.2008 | PT | 23.12.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
GR | 24.10.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 23.07.2008 | |
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4578061 (LEMELSON JEROME H [US]) [X] 1-5,12,32 * the whole document * [A] 6-11,13-19; | [XA]US5419777 (HOFLING BERTHOLD [DE]) [X] 1-7,11-14,32 * the whole document *[A] 8-10,15-19 | International search | [X]US5419777 (HOFLING BERTHOLD [DE]) |