EP1305716 - FLASHTOASTER FOR READING SEVERAL TYPES OF FLASH MEMORY CARDS WITH OR WITHOUT A PC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MCM Portfolio LLC 20400 Stevens Creek Boulevard Fifth Floor Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2009/34] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states MCM Portfolio LLC 20400 Stevens Creek Blvd., Suite 500 Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | ||
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states Onspec Electronic, Inc. 2970 Scott Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Larry, Lawson 1407 Hamilton Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 02 /
MAMBAKKAM, Sreenath 2841 Rainwood Court San Jose, CA 95148 / US | 03 /
AROCKIYASWAMY, Venkidu 112 Princeton Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | ||
Former [2007/09] | Watkins, David, et al Beresford & Co 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | ||
Former [2003/18] | Picker, Madeline Margaret Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01952974.2 | 03.07.2001 | [2003/18] | WO2001US41249 | Priority number, date | US20000610904 | 06.07.2000 Original published format: US 610904 | [2003/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0205102 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1305716 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/00, G06K19/07, G06K7/00, G06F13/38 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
G06F13/387 (EP,US);
G06F13/00 (KR);
G06F13/38 (EP,US);
G06F13/385 (EP,US);
G06F13/4027 (EP,US);
G06F3/0646 (US);
G06K19/07741 (EP,US);
G06K7/0013 (EP,US);
G06K7/0043 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/18] | G06F13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2003/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLASHTOASTER ZUM LESEN MEHRERER ARTEN VON FLASH-SPEICHERKARTEN MIT ODER OHNE PC | [2003/18] | English: | FLASHTOASTER FOR READING SEVERAL TYPES OF FLASH MEMORY CARDS WITH OR WITHOUT A PC | [2003/18] | French: | LECTEUR DE CARTE DE MEMOIRE FLASH (FLASHTOASTER) PERMETTANT DE LIRE DIFFERENTS TYPES DE CARTES DE MEMOIRE FLASH AVEC OU SANS UN ORDINATEUR PERSONNEL | [2003/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2002 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 23.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/30] | 11.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/30] | Divisional application(s) | EP09005852.0 / EP2085887 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0775964 (STOCKO METALLWARENFAB HENKELS [DE]) [A] 1,13* column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 25; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]US5752857 (KNIGHTS ANTHONY JOHN [US]) [Y] 1,34-37,41 * column 4, line 10 - line 15 * * column 4, line 50 - line 62 * * column 5, line 42 - line 56 * * column 6, line 28 - line 38 * * column 7, line 9 - line 51 * * figures 4,7,8 *; | [A]US5887145 (HARARI ELIYAHOU [US], et al) [A] 2,14 * column 11, line 63 - line 67 *; | [XY]EP0987876 (SMARTDISK CORP [US]) [X] 13,15-22,24,27-33,42-44 * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] * * paragraphs [0017] - [0019] * * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] * * paragraph [0042] * [Y] 1,34-37,41 | International search | [Y]US6075706 (LEARMONTH IIAN THOMAS [GB], et al); | [YE]US6264506 (YASUFUKU KAORI [JP], et al) | Examination | US6006295 |