EP1268592 - ALKOXYMETHYL MELAMINE CROSSLINKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 14.03.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CYTEC SURFACE SPECIALTIES, S.A. Square Marie Curie 11 1070 Bruxelles / BE | [2005/39] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Surface Specialties S.A. Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states UCB S.A. Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Solutia Inc. 575 Maryville Centre Drive, P.O. Box 66760 St. Louis, Missouri 63166-6760 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPITZ, George, T. 52 Barbara Lane Longmeadow, MA 0116 / US | 02 /
VAUGHN, George, D. 175 Granville Road Southwick, MA 01077-9666 / US | 03 /
BALL, Patricia, A. 67 Wilmont Street Chicopee, MA 01013 / US | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Deckers, Hellmuth Alexander European Patent Attorney Breitbachstrasse 15 55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Deckers, Hellmuth Alexander European Patent Attorney, Bahnhofstrasse 26A 55218 Ingelheim / DE | ||
Former [2003/01] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr. Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01953018.7 | 14.02.2001 | [2003/01] | WO2001US04596 | Priority number, date | US20000182630P | 15.02.2000 Original published format: US 182630 P | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0160882 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1268592 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1268592 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08G12/42, C07D251/64, C08K5/3492 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
C07D251/64 (EP,US);
C08G12/42 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D251/70 (EP,US);
C08G12/427 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALKOXYMETHYLMELAMIN VERNETZER | [2003/01] | English: | ALKOXYMETHYL MELAMINE CROSSLINKERS | [2003/01] | French: | AGENTS DE RETICULATION D'ALCOXYMETHYL MELAMINE | [2005/18] |
Former [2003/01] | AGENTS DE RETICULATION D'ALCOXYMETHYL MELANINE | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 14.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.2006
01.08.2006
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Isenbruck, Günter, et al, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.2006
01.08.2006
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Isenbruck, Günter, et al, et al Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2006/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.2006
BASF Aktiengesellschaft Global Intellectual Property Carl-Bosch-Str. 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Isenbruck, Günter, et al, et al Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | 30.08.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.01.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.10.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.10.2007 | 02.10.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.10.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 10.12.2007 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.10.2005 | BE | 26.10.2005 | CH | 26.10.2005 | CY | 26.10.2005 | FI | 26.10.2005 | FR | 26.10.2005 | IT | 26.10.2005 | LI | 26.10.2005 | NL | 26.10.2005 | TR | 26.10.2005 | DK | 26.01.2006 | GR | 26.01.2006 | SE | 26.01.2006 | DE | 27.01.2006 | ES | 06.02.2006 | GB | 14.02.2006 | IE | 14.02.2006 | LU | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | PT | 27.03.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/52] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
FR | 26.10.2005 | ||
IT | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
TR | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
DE | 27.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
GB | 14.02.2006 | ||
IE | 14.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IT | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
TR | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
DE | 27.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
GB | 14.02.2006 | ||
IE | 14.02.2006 | ||
FR | 28.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IT | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
TR | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
DE | 27.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
GB | 14.02.2006 | ||
IE | 14.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
FR | 15.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
IT | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
DE | 27.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
GB | 14.02.2006 | ||
IE | 14.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
FR | 15.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
DE | 27.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
GB | 14.02.2006 | ||
IE | 14.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
FR | 15.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
DE | 27.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
GB | 14.02.2006 | ||
IE | 14.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
DE | 27.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
IE | 14.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
DE | 27.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
DE | 27.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
GR | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
BE | 26.10.2005 | ||
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 26.10.2005 | |
CH | 26.10.2005 | ||
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
DK | 26.01.2006 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 26.10.2005 | |
FI | 26.10.2005 | ||
LI | 26.10.2005 | ||
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
ES | 06.02.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
SE | 26.01.2006 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 26.10.2005 | |
NL | 26.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4433143 (SANTER J OWEN [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * claim 1 * * examples 1-3 *; | [A]US4575536 (YAMADA MITSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * claims 1,3 *; | [DA]EP0374340 (BASF CORP [US]) [DA] 1-16 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP0668334 (CYTEC TECH CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * claims 1,2,5-7,15 * * page 4, lines 2,3 * * page 4, lines 10,11 * * page 4, line 22 *; | [A]US5939195 (ALLEN KAREN B [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * table A * * claims 1,4 *; | [A]US5981074 (WU KUANG JONG [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * claims 1,6,21,22 ** column 5, lines 8-32 * |