EP1317428 - PYRROLIDINE-2-CARBOXYLIC ACID HYDRAZIDE DERIVATIVES FOR USE AS METALLOPROTEASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2003/24] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AEBI, Johannes Wallstrasse 13 CH-4051 Basle / CH | 02 /
DEHMLOW, Henrietta Ritterstrasse 85 79639 Grenzach-Wyhlen / DE | 03 /
KITAS, Eric, Argirios Eichbergweg 4 CH-4147 Aesch / CH | [2003/24] | Representative(s) | Witte, Hubert Grenzacherstrasse, 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | Witte, Hubert, Dr. 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 01954031.9 | 11.07.2001 | [2003/24] | WO2001EP07995 | Priority number, date | EP20000114948 | 19.07.2000 Original published format: EP 00114948 | [2003/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0206224 | Date: | 24.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1317428 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1317428 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/16, C07D405/12, C07D401/12, C07D409/12, A61K31/401, A61P9/00 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D207/48 (KR);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYRROLIDIN-2-CARBONSÄURE-HYDRAZID-DERIVATE ALS METALLOPROTEASE-INHIBITOREN | [2003/24] | English: | PYRROLIDINE-2-CARBOXYLIC ACID HYDRAZIDE DERIVATIVES FOR USE AS METALLOPROTEASE INHIBITORS | [2003/24] | French: | DÉRIVÉS D'HYDRAZIDE DE L'ACIDE PYRROLIDONE-2-CARBOXYLIQUE UTILISÉS COMME INHIBITEURS DES MÉTALLOPROTÉASES | [2005/44] |
Former [2003/24] | D RIV S D'HYDRAZIDE DE L'ACIDE PYRROLIDONE-2-CARBOXYLIQUE UTILIS S COMME INHIBITEURS DES M TALLOPROT ASES | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 30.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.04.2006 | FI | 19.04.2006 | TR | 19.04.2006 | IE | 11.07.2006 | LU | 11.07.2006 | DK | 19.07.2006 | GR | 20.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | PT | 19.09.2006 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/03] | CY | 19.04.2006 | |
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IE | 11.07.2006 | ||
LU | 11.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
IE | 11.07.2006 | ||
LU | 11.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
IE | 11.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
IE | 11.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
IE | 11.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
IE | 11.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 19.04.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4933333 (SUNAGAWA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-25* Formula III, examples 1-43, 1-44, 1-45 *; | [A]WO9808815 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document * |