EP1316155 - COMMUNICATING INFORMATION VIA A FRAME CHECK SEQUENCE HAVING AN INFORMATION BLOCK ASSOCIATED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IRVIN, David, R. 1546 Iredell Road Raleigh, NC 27608 / US | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Holmberg, Nils Anders Patrik, et al BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Holmberg, Nils Anders Patrik, et al Dr Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 17192 104 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 01954643.1 | 11.07.2001 | [2003/23] | WO2001US21850 | Priority number, date | US20000634031 | 08.08.2000 Original published format: US 634031 | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0213393 | Date: | 14.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1316155 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1316155 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/09, G06F11/10, H04L12/46 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
H03M13/091 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERMITTLUNG VON INFORMATION MITTELS EINER RAHMENPRÜFMUSTERFOLGE WOMIT EIN INFORMATIONSBLOCK ASSOZIIERT IST | [2003/23] | English: | COMMUNICATING INFORMATION VIA A FRAME CHECK SEQUENCE HAVING AN INFORMATION BLOCK ASSOCIATED THEREWITH | [2003/23] | French: | PROCEDES, DISPOSITIFS DE COMMUNICATION ET PRODUITS DE PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE SERVANT A COMMUNIQUER DES INFORMATIONS VIA UNE SEQUENCE DE CONTROLE DE TRAME A LAQUELLE UN BLOC D'INFORMATIONS EST ASSOCIE | [2003/23] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 04.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.11.2004 | BE | 10.11.2004 | CH | 10.11.2004 | FI | 10.11.2004 | FR | 10.11.2004 | IT | 10.11.2004 | LI | 10.11.2004 | NL | 10.11.2004 | TR | 10.11.2004 | DK | 10.02.2005 | GR | 10.02.2005 | SE | 10.02.2005 | DE | 11.02.2005 | ES | 21.02.2005 | PT | 10.04.2005 | CY | 11.07.2005 | IE | 11.07.2005 | LU | 11.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BE | 10.11.2004 | ||
CH | 10.11.2004 | ||
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
IT | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
DE | 11.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
CY | 11.07.2005 | ||
IE | 11.07.2005 | ||
LU | 11.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BE | 10.11.2004 | ||
CH | 10.11.2004 | ||
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
DE | 11.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
CY | 11.07.2005 | ||
IE | 11.07.2005 | ||
LU | 11.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BE | 10.11.2004 | ||
CH | 10.11.2004 | ||
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
DE | 11.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
CY | 11.07.2005 | ||
IE | 11.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BE | 10.11.2004 | ||
CH | 10.11.2004 | ||
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
DE | 11.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
IE | 11.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BE | 10.11.2004 | ||
CH | 10.11.2004 | ||
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
DE | 11.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
IE | 11.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BE | 10.11.2004 | ||
CH | 10.11.2004 | ||
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
FR | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
DE | 11.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
IE | 11.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BE | 10.11.2004 | ||
CH | 10.11.2004 | ||
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
DE | 11.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
IE | 11.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BE | 10.11.2004 | ||
CH | 10.11.2004 | ||
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
DE | 11.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
IE | 11.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BE | 10.11.2004 | ||
CH | 10.11.2004 | ||
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
DE | 11.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
BE | 10.11.2004 | ||
CH | 10.11.2004 | ||
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
CH | 10.11.2004 | ||
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
CH | 10.11.2004 | ||
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 10.11.2004 | |
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
ES | 21.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 10.11.2004 | |
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 10.11.2004 | |
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
LI | 10.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 10.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5930367 (OSAWA YOSHITOMO [JP], et al) [A] 1-32 * column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 4 * * column 7, line 23 - column 8, line 67 * * figure 4 *; | [A] - IRVIN D R, "PRESERVING THE INTEGRITY OF CYCLIC REDUNDANCY CHECKS WHEN PROTECTEDTEXT IS INTENTIONALLY ALTERED", IBM JOURNAL OF RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, IBM CORPORATION, ARMONK, US, (19891101), vol. 33, no. 6, ISSN 0018-8646, pages 618 - 626, XP000115749 [A] 1-32 * page 1, column 1, line 1 - page 8, column 2, line L * | [A] - NN, "TECHNIQUE FOR CYCLIC REDUNDANCY CHECK MODIFICATION USEFUL IN CERTAIN DATA NETWORKS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19940601), vol. 37, no. 6B, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 267 - 271, XP000456002 [A] 1 * page 267, line 1 - page 271, line L * |