EP1314212 - COMPRESSION MEMBER FOR PROTON EXCHANGE MEMBRANE ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proton Energy Systems 50 Inwood Road Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US | [2003/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOLTER, Trent, M. 114 Harvest Lane Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | 02 /
DRISTY, Mark, E. 136 West Main Street 2nd Floor Kutztown, PA 19530 / US | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01954796.7 | 20.07.2001 | [2003/22] | WO2001US22845 | Priority number, date | US20000219526P | 20.07.2000 Original published format: US 219526 P | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0209208 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1314212 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/00 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
H01M8/0247 (EP,US);
C25B9/73 (EP,US);
H01M8/0202 (EP,US);
H01M8/025 (EP,US);
H01M8/0273 (EP,US);
H01M8/242 (EP,US);
H01M8/247 (EP,US);
H01M8/248 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0082 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKELEMENT FÜR ELEKTROCHEMISCHES ZELLSYSTEM MIT PROTONENAUSTAUSCHERMEMBRAN | [2003/22] | English: | COMPRESSION MEMBER FOR PROTON EXCHANGE MEMBRANE ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL SYSTEM | [2003/22] | French: | SYSTEME DE CELLULE ELECTROCHIMIQUE A MEMBRANE D'ECHANGE DE PROTONS | [2003/22] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 01.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/38] | 20.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0039362 (PROTON ENERGY SYS INC [US]) [A] 1-3,5,6,16,17,19 * page 3, line 2 - line 5 * * page 2, line 11 - line 25 * * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 4 * * page 4, line 8 - line 20 *; | [A]US5629104 (CRAWFORD SR MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 1,4,16 * column 2, line 31 - line 35 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 24 * * column 6, line 16 - line 32 *; | [A]US5736269 (OKAMOTO TAKAFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,16 * column 3, line 33 - line 52 * * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 10 * |