EP1303692 - METHOD FOR SYNCHRONIZING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Hong Spitzweg Str. 16 93105 Tegernheim / DE | [2003/17] | Application number, filing date | 01955259.5 | 19.07.2001 | [2003/17] | WO2001DE02734 | Priority number, date | DE2000136436 | 26.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10036436 | [2003/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0208596 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1303692 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1303692 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/36, F02D41/06, F02P7/077, F02D41/34 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
F02D41/009 (EP);
F02D41/36 (KR);
F02P7/0775 (EP);
F02B2075/182 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2003/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SYNCHRONISIEREN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2003/17] | English: | METHOD FOR SYNCHRONIZING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2003/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE SYNCHRONISATION D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2005/25] |
Former [2003/17] | PROC D DE SYNCHRONISATION D'UN MOTEUR COMBUSTION INTERNE | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 08.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE19638010 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1,3 * column 1, line 25 - line 36 * * column 3, line 51 - line 63 * * column 4, line 9 - line 25 * * column 5, line 8 - line 26 * * figure . *; | [A]JPH08121299 ; | [A]US4889094 (BEYER HANS-ERNST [DE], et al) [A] 1,3 * figure - * * column 1, line 7 - line 12 * * column 2, line 6 - line 37 * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, & JP08121299 A 19960514 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,3 * abstract * |