EP1312364 - GATIFLOXACIN AS CYTOKINE PRODUCTION INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/21] | CYTOKINE PRODUCTION INHIBITORS | ||
[2006/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senju Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 5-8, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | For all designated states Kyorin Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 5, Kandasurugadai 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8311 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Senju Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 5-8, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | ||
For all designated states KYORIN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 5, Kandasurugadai 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8311 / JP | |||
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Senju Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 5-8, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | ||
For all designated states Kyorin Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 5, Kandasurugadai 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8311 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOKUSHIGE, Hideki 4-366-1-102, Minamibefu, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2116 / JP | 02 /
YOKOGAKI, Shuichi 533-6, Kuzumoto-cho Kashihara-shi, Nara 634-0007 / JP | 03 /
NAKA, Hiroaki 39-3, Tainohata Minamimachi, Suma-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 654-0132 / JP | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae Elkington & Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 01955609.1 | 09.08.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001JP06839 | Priority number, date | JP20000245831 | 14.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000245831 | [2003/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0213830 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1312364 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1312364 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/496, A61P43/00, A61P29/00 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,KR,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/21] | A61K31/496, A61P43/00, A61P29/00, // C07D401:04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GATIFLOXACIN ALS INHIBITOR DER CYTOKINPRODUKTION | [2006/23] | English: | GATIFLOXACIN AS CYTOKINE PRODUCTION INHIBITOR | [2006/23] | French: | GATIFLOXACIN COMME INHIBITEUR DE LA PRODUCTION DE CYTOKINES | [2006/23] |
Former [2003/21] | INHIBITOREN DER CYTOKINPRODUKTION | ||
Former [2003/21] | CYTOKINE PRODUCTION INHIBITORS | ||
Former [2003/21] | INHIBITEURS DE LA PRODUCTION DE CYTOKINES | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2003 | Translation filed | 12.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 11.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2006 | BE | 22.11.2006 | CH | 22.11.2006 | CY | 22.11.2006 | FI | 22.11.2006 | LI | 22.11.2006 | NL | 22.11.2006 | TR | 22.11.2006 | DK | 22.02.2007 | SE | 22.02.2007 | GR | 23.02.2007 | PT | 23.04.2007 | IE | 09.08.2007 | LU | 09.08.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
CY | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
IE | 09.08.2007 | ||
LU | 09.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
IE | 09.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
SE | 22.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6010711 (O'KEEFE REGIS JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,10* figure 3; claims 1-8 * | International search | [A]WO9001950 (CELLTECH LTD [GB]); | [A]WO9420105 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]JPH10130149 (SANKYO CO, et al); | [X]JPH10130240 (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO); | [X]WO0018409 (A & SCIENCE INVEST AB [SE], et al) |