EP1427026 - LIGHT-EMITTING OR LIGHT-RECEIVING SEMICONDUCTOR MODULE AND METHOD OF ITS MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPHELAR POWER CORPORATION 949-2, Ebisu-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8201 / JP | [2014/37] |
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Kyosemi Corporation 949-2, Ebisu-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8201 / JP | ||
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Nakata, Josuke 29-3, Goryoooeyama-cho 4-chome Nishikyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 610-1102 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Price, Nigel John King, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/10] | Price, Nigel John King, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2004/24] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 01955694.3 | 13.08.2001 | [2004/24] | WO2001JP06972 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03017382 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1427026 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/072, H01L31/103, H01L33/00, H01L29/06 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
H01L33/20 (EP,US);
H01L25/0753 (EP,US);
H01L31/035281 (EP,US);
H01L31/048 (EP,US);
H01L31/0504 (EP,US);
H01L33/24 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16145 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1017 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2004/24] | Title | German: | LICHTEMISSIONS- ODER LICHTEMPFANGS-HALBLEITERMODUL UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2004/24] | English: | LIGHT-EMITTING OR LIGHT-RECEIVING SEMICONDUCTOR MODULE AND METHOD OF ITS MANUFACTURE | [2004/24] | French: | MODULE A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR EMETTEUR DE LUMIERE OU RECEPTEUR DE LUMIERE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | [2004/24] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2004 | Translation filed | 23.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 07.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/34] | 10.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001210848 ; | [A]US3433676 (STEIN FRANK S) [A] 5-11 * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 16 *; | [A]US5538902 (IZU HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 5-11 * column 9, line 4 - column 13, line 3 *; | [A]WO9836461 (OBERMAN DAVID [US]) [A] 1,5,12,13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0982780 (NAKATA JOSUKE [JP]) [A] 5-11 * paragraphs [0039] - [0048] *; | [E]WO0235612 (NAKATA JOSUKE [JP]) [E] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [E]WO0235613 (NAKATA JOSUKE [JP]) [E] 1-13* the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010412), vol. 2000, no. 25, & JP2001210848 A 20010803 (MITSUI HIGH TEC) [A] 1,5,12,13 * paragraphs [0021] - [0026] * | International search | [Y]JP2001177132 (MITSUI HIGH TEC); | [Y]JP2001156315 (MITSUI HIGH TEC); | [Y]JP2001168369 (NAKADA JOYU); | [Y]WO9815983 (NAKATA JOSUKE [JP]); | [A]US4691076 (LEVINE JULES D [US], et al); | [A]JPH09162434 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2001102618 (SONY CORP); | [A]US5469020 (HERRICK BRADLEY R [US]); | [A]JPH0536997 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2000022184 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) | Examination | US3984256 |