EP1312472 - SHEET-FORM LAYERED STRUCTURE WITH ATTRACTIVE APPEARANCE AND UTILIZATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Chemicals, Ltd. 2-1, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | [2008/14] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Teijin Chemicals, Ltd. 2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOTAKA, Toshiaki, c/o Teijin Chemicals Ltd. 2-1, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | 02 /
HISAKI, Kazuma, c/o Teijin Chemicals Ltd. 2-1, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | 03 /
FURUKAWA, Ikkoh, c/o Teijin Chemicals Ltd. 2-1, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | [2009/07] |
Former [2003/21] | 01 /
HOTAKA, Toshiaki, Teijin Chemicals, Ltd. 2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | ||
02 /
HISAKI, Kazuma, Teijin Chemicals, Ltd. 2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | |||
03 /
FURUKAWA, Ikkoh, Teijin Chemicals, Ltd. 2-2, Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al Kraus, Weisert & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01955703.2 | 13.08.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001JP06990 | Priority number, date | JP20000248467 | 18.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000248467 | JP20000307171 | 06.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000307171 | JP20000317793 | 18.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000317793 | JP20010043923 | 20.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001043923 | [2003/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0216132 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1312472 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1312472 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/20, B32B3/26, B29C45/16 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B32B3/263 (US);
B44C5/04 (EP,US);
B44F1/08 (EP,US);
B44F1/14 (EP,US);
B32B2451/00 (US);
B32B2605/08 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1393 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/21] | B32B27/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2003/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | TUCHFORMARTIGE STRUKTUR MIT ATTRAKTIVER ERSCHEINUNG SOWIE DEREN ANWENDUNG | [2003/21] | English: | SHEET-FORM LAYERED STRUCTURE WITH ATTRACTIVE APPEARANCE AND UTILIZATION THEREOF | [2003/21] | French: | STRUCTURE STRATIFIEE D'ASPECT ATTRAYANT ET SON UTILISATION | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2002 | Translation filed | 18.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2002 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 07.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2985556 (ROWLAND WILLIAM P) [X] 1,3,4,7,8 * column 1, line 15 - column 6, line 69; figure - * * column 3, lines 30-37 *; | [X]US3288666 (DACEY RAYMOND B) [X] 1,2,4 * column 1, line 9; figures 2,4 *; | [X]EP0464790 (SEIKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,10-13,16,19,26,30,34,35 * page 2, line 56 - page 4, line 24; figure -; example - * * page 5, line 10 - page 7, line 38; figure 22 * * page 6, lines 40-45 * * page 2, lines 10-14 *; | [X]WO9305946 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1,3,4 * figure -; example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0776788 (NEYR PLASTIQUES SA [FR]) [A] 1-41* the whole document * | International search | [X]JPS5383884 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD); | [X]JPS56123235 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [X]JPH01206010 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [Y]JPH01249336 (OSAKA SHINKU KAGAKU KK); | [X]JPH0631862 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X]JPH07125000 (KAMAYA KAGAKU KOGYO CO LTD) |