EP1212021 - ULTRASOUND HANDPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcon, Inc. Bösch 69 6331 Hünenberg / CH | [2006/37] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states Alcon Inc. Bösch 69 6331 Hünenberg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHON, James, Y. 115 W. Yale Loop Irvine, CA 92604 / US | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2003/33] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley, 11 Mespil Road Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2002/24] | Hanna, Peter William Derek Peter Hanna Associates 11 Mespil Road Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 01955924.4 | 23.07.2001 | [2002/24] | WO2001US23194 | Priority number, date | US20000625294 | 25.07.2000 Original published format: US 625294 | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0207658 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1212021 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1212021 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/007 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
A61F9/00745 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0813 (EP,US);
A61F9/00763 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/24] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLHANDSTÜCK | [2002/24] | English: | ULTRASOUND HANDPIECE | [2002/24] | French: | PIECE A MAIN A ULTRASONS | [2002/24] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 17.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.05.2005 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 06.06.2005 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 22.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.03.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06112725.4 / EP1679053 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.09.2006 | TR | 13.09.2006 | GR | 14.12.2006 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 13.09.2006 | |
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | GR | 14.12.2006 | |
Former [2008/04] | deleted | ||
Former [2007/36] | IT | 13.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5061238 (SHULER DONALD K [US]) [A] 7,8 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 12 *; | [XAY]EP0490085 (STORZ INSTR CO [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 6; figure 3 * [A] 2,5 [Y] 4,6; | [XA]US5364405 (ZALESKI EDWARD R [US]) [X] 1 * column 8, line 63 - line 66; figure 8 * [A] 4; | [A]US5505693 (MACKOOL RICHARD J [US]) [A] 7* column 8, line 45 - line 47 *; | [YD]US5911699 (ANIS AZIZ Y [US], et al) [YD] 4,6 * column 16, line 5 - line 13; figure 20 * | by applicant | US4504264 | US5222959 | US5492528 | US5722945 | US5730718 | US5827292 | US5911699 |