EP1433239 - DC TO DC CONVERTER AND POWER MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL POWER SYSTEMS, INC. 444 - 5th Avenue, SW 1100 Calgary Alberta T2P 2T8 / CA | [2016/13] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL POWER SYSTEMS, INC. 444 - 5th Avenue, SW 1100 Calgary, Alberta T2P 2T8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DROPPO, Gerald, W. 2408 Lariat Lane Richland, WA 99352 / US | 02 /
SCHIENBEIN, Lawrence, A. 4006 South Morain Loop Kennewick, WA 99337 / US | 03 /
HARRIS, Brent, Earle 504 823 Royal Avenue SW Calgary, Alberta T2T 0L4 / CA | 04 /
HAMMERSTROM, Donald, J. 3203 Mount Daniel West Richland, WA 99353 / US | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2016/13] |
Former [2004/27] | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake & Co Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01956002.8 | 27.07.2001 | [2004/27] | WO2001US23681 | Priority number, date | US20000221596P | 28.07.2000 Original published format: US 221596 P | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0211267 | Date: | 07.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1433239 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1433239 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/34, H02M3/158, H02M1/34, H02M3/155 | [2015/40] | CPC: |
H02M1/34 (EP,US);
H02J7/34 (EP,US);
H02M3/155 (EP,US);
H02M3/158 (EP,US);
H02M1/342 (EP,US);
Y02B40/00 (US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/32] | H02J7/34, H02M3/158 | ||
Former IPC [2004/27] | H02J7/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/13] |
Former [2004/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | GLEICHSTROM-GLEICHSTROMWANDLER UND LEISTUNGSSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM | [2004/27] | English: | DC TO DC CONVERTER AND POWER MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2004/27] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR CC/CC ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE PUISSANCE | [2015/45] |
Former [2004/27] | CONVERTISSEUR CC/CC ET SYSTEME DE GESTION DE PUISSANCE | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.02.2003 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 22.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 09.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.11.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.03.2016 | BE | 30.03.2016 | CY | 30.03.2016 | DK | 30.03.2016 | ES | 30.03.2016 | FI | 30.03.2016 | MC | 30.03.2016 | NL | 30.03.2016 | SE | 30.03.2016 | TR | 30.03.2016 | GR | 01.07.2016 | IE | 27.07.2016 | LU | 27.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | PT | 01.08.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/41] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IE | 27.07.2016 | ||
LU | 27.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
GR | 01.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5334463 (TAJIMA OSAMU [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,10-12,14 * abstract * * column 5, line 8 * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE19810468 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,9-11,13,14 * column 3 - column 4 * * figure 3 *; | [XA]US5714874 (BONNEFOY PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1-3,10,11 * abstract * * paragraph [000I] * * page 287; figure 2 * * column 2, line 46 - line 62 * [A] 4-9,12-14; | [XY]US5734258 (ESSER ALBERT ANDREAS MARIA [US]) [X] 15-19,23,24,26,27 * column 4, line 40 - line 67 * * column 5, line 1 - line 34 * * figures 1,3A,6 * [Y] 20-22; | [X] - CARICCHI F ET AL, "Study of bi-directional buck-boost converter topologies for application in electrical vehicle motor drives", APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION, 1998. APEC '98. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS 1998., THIRTEENTH ANNUAL ANAHEIM, CA, USA 15-19 FEB. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980215), ISBN 0-7803-4340-9, pages 287 - 293, XP010263608 [X] 15-19 * paragraph [000I] * * page 287; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APEC.1998.647705 | [YD] - C M DA CUNHA DUARTE, I BARBI, "A new family of ZVS-PWM active clamping DC-to-DC boost converters: analysis, Design and Experimentation", IEE TRANSACTION ON POWER ELECTRONICS, (199709), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 824 - 831, XP002203819 [YD] 20-22 * abstract * * figure 1C * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/63.623000 | Examination | US4636931 | WO9618937 | EP0734111 | WO9834314 | by applicant | US4636931 | WO9618937 |