EP1307126 - HOT-AIR LID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holl, Josef Feldstrasse 8 4863 Seewalchen / AT | [2003/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Postfach 411 4010 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | Hübscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 01956207.3 | 08.08.2001 | [2003/19] | WO2001AT00263 | Priority number, date | AT20000001374 | 09.08.2000 Original published format: AT 13742000 | [2003/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0211591 | Date: | 14.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1307126 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1307126 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47J36/06 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
A47J36/064 (EP,US);
Y10S220/912 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/19] | Title | German: | HEISSLUFTDECKEL | [2003/19] | English: | HOT-AIR LID | [2003/19] | French: | COUVERCLE A AIR CHAUD | [2003/19] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.06.2008 | DK | 18.06.2008 | FI | 18.06.2008 | IE | 18.06.2008 | IT | 18.06.2008 | NL | 18.06.2008 | TR | 18.06.2008 | AT | 08.08.2008 | LU | 08.08.2008 | BE | 31.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | FR | 01.09.2008 | GB | 18.09.2008 | SE | 18.09.2008 | GR | 19.09.2008 | ES | 29.09.2008 | PT | 18.11.2008 | [2011/47] |
Former [2010/47] | CY | 18.06.2008 | |
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
TR | 18.06.2008 | ||
AT | 08.08.2008 | ||
LU | 08.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
GB | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
GR | 19.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/37] | CY | 18.06.2008 | |
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
TR | 18.06.2008 | ||
AT | 08.08.2008 | ||
LU | 08.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
GB | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 18.06.2008 | |
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
AT | 08.08.2008 | ||
LU | 08.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
GB | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | DK | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
AT | 08.08.2008 | ||
LU | 08.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
GB | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | DK | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
AT | 08.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
GB | 18.09.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/50] | DK | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
AT | 08.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | DK | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/32] | DK | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | FI | 18.06.2008 | |
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | FI | 18.06.2008 | |
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 18.06.2008 | |
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | FI | 18.06.2008 | |
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 18.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2573719 (LEBHERZ HARRY J) [A] 1 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 22; figure 2 *; | [A]US2742850 (LA FOND LOUIS A) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 47-52 * * column 2, lines 13-16 ** figure 2 * | by applicant | DE4412843 | EP0712596 | US5584235 | EP0780078 | EP0788754 |